JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. et al v. KING et al
Plaintiff: TRUE THE VOTE and JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Defendant: J. BRADLEY KING, CONNIE LAWSON and TRENT DECKARD
Case Number: 1:2012cv00800
Filed: June 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: William T. Lawrence
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The parties in this case have filed cross motions for summary judgment, which are fully briefed. In reviewing the motions, the Court has come to believe that the Defendants are entitled to summary judgment, but on a ground th at is not squarely raised by the Defendants. Accordingly, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(f), the Court hereby gives the Plaintiffs notice of its intent to enter summary judgment against them as explained below absent a showing by t he Plaintiffs that such a ruling would not be in accordance with the applicable law. If the Plaintiffs disagree with the Court's assessment of the applicable law, or if they believe they have demonstrated an ongoing violation of federal law, t hey shall respond to this order to show cause, in writing, within 21 days of the date of this Entry. The Defendants need not respond to the Plaintiffs' filing absent an invitation to do so by the Court. ***SEE ORDER***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 5/13/2014. (JKS)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 39 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 3/20/2013. Copy Mailed. (JD)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ENTRY ON MOTION TO DISMISS: For the reasons set forth above, the Defendants' motion to dismiss 20 DENIED in its entirety. The Plaintiffs' motion for oral argument 27 is DENIED AS MOOT ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 12/10/2012. (DW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. et al v. KING et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUE THE VOTE
Represented By: Joshua Braden Bolinger
Represented By: Chris Fedeli
Represented By: David R. Langdon
Represented By: Paul J. Orfanedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Represented By: Joshua Braden Bolinger
Represented By: Chris Fedeli
Represented By: David R. Langdon
Represented By: Paul J. Orfanedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. BRADLEY KING
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Don R. Hostetler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE LAWSON
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Don R. Hostetler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRENT DECKARD
Represented By: Don R. Hostetler
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?