PANNELL v. NEAL
Petitioner: DAVID PANNELL
Respondent: WILLIAM WILSON
Case Number: 1:2012cv01301
Filed: September 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order Granting and Denying Pending Motions: Because the petitioner plainly does not seek to convert his timely Rule 59(e) to a Rule 60(b) motion for relief from judgment, his motions to amend the Rule 59(e) motion [dkt 92 and 93] are denie d. By the same token, however, the motion to amend the motion to alter or amend judgment filed on April 13, 2015 [dkt 90] is granted. Accordingly, the motion to alter or amend judgment [dkt 89] is denied ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/4/2015. Copy sent via US Mail. (DW)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ENTRY Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Denying Certificate of Appealability. Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/19/2015. Copy sent to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (BGT)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ENTRY Discussing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Denying Certificate of Appealability: Having considered the amended petition for writ of habeas corpus, the expanded record and the parties' argument s, and being duly advised, the Court finds that the amended petition must be denied. In addition, the Court finds that a certificate of appealability should not be issued (see Entry for details). Copy to Petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/10/2015.(SWM)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying as moot 64 Pannell's Motion for Extension of Time to File and denying 65 Pannell's Motion for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (SEE ORDER). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/15/2014. (copy to Petitioner via US Mail) (JKS)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ENTRY Concerning Selected Matters: The respondent's third motion for extension of time [dkt. 60] is granted. The respondent shall have through November 17, 2014, in which to file an answer or return to order to show cause. The petitioner shall have twenty (20) days after service of such answer or return to order to show cause on him in which to reply. The petitioner's motion for the production of documents 56 and motion for leave to file motion for discovery 57 do not separately warrant discovery at this time. The motions [dkts. 56, 57] are therefore denied. The petitioner's motion to order respondent to grant petitioner additional access to the prison law library [dkt. 58] is denied (see Entry for details). Copy to Petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/2/2014. (SWM)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PRO. 58: For the reasons detailed in the accompanying Order, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT. The action is dismissed without prejudice. Copy to Petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/1/2014.(SWM)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTRY denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/9/2012. Copy Mailed. (JD) Modified to opinion on 11/9/2012 (JD).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PANNELL v. NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID PANNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?