LEBLANC v. TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY
Plaintiff: Dr. VIRGINIA LEBLANC
Defendant: THE TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY
Interested Party: Douglas Howard, Natalie Lile, Amos N Jones and J. Anthony Goebel
Intervenor: Natalie R Lile
Case Number: 1:2012cv01574
Filed: October 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Denise K LaRue
Referring Judge: Larry J McKinney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER - The Motion to Seal Notice of Satisfaction [doc. #68 ] is DENIED and the Clerk is DIRECTED to unseal the Notice of Satisfaction of Attorney's Fee Charging Liens [doc. #67 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 11/1/2013. (JD)
October 2, 2013 Filing 69 CLOSED DISMISSED - The #66 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice is acknowledged, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 10/2/2013. (copy to Plaintiff via US Mail) (JKS)
September 30, 2013 Filing 68 MOTION to Seal Document #67 SEALED Document , filed by Intervenor Natalie R Lile. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Howard, Douglas)
September 30, 2013 Filing 67 *UNEALED PER DKT. NO. #70 * SEALED Notice of Satisfaction, filed by Intervenor Natalie R Lile. (Howard, Douglas) Modified on 11/1/2013 (JD).
September 27, 2013 Filing 66 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC, Defendant TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Maley, John)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; The Court hereby orders parties to file their Stipulation of Dismissal, on or before OCTOBER 18, 2013. On or before this date, the parties shall also address the Notices of Attorney Fee Charging Liens filed at Docket Nos. 39, 45, 46 and 47. Any previously-ordered dates and deadlines are VACATED and any pending motions are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 9/18/2013.(CKM)
September 16, 2013 Filing 64 MOTION to Seal Document #63 SEALED MOTION for Declaratory Judgment, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(JKS)
September 16, 2013 Filing 63 SEALED MOTION For Declaratory Judgment, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(JKS)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER - Plaintiff's Notice to the Court Regarding Request for Order, Document Number #55 shall remain under seal until further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 9/5/2013. (copy to Dr. Virginia LeBlanc via US Mail) (JKS)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER - Defendant's Notice to the Court Regarding Its Position, Document Number #51 , shall remain under seal until further Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 9/5/2013. (copy to Dr. Virginia LeBlanc via US Mail) (JKS)
September 3, 2013 Filing 60 MOTION-Rebuttal and request for dismissal regarding Natalie R. Lile's Notice of Attny's fee charging lien c/s, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Letter dated 8/4/2011, #2 Exhibit B-Letter dated 1/17/2013, #3 Envelope)(CBU)
August 30, 2013 Filing 59 MOTION -Rebuttal and Request for dismissal regarding J. Anthony Goebel Notice of Attnys' fee charging lien c/s, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhbit B, #3 Envelope)(CBU)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER - granting #53 Motion for Status Conference; Scheduling: Status Conference set for 9/5/2013 03:00 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 8/29/2013.(CKM)
August 29, 2013 Filing 57 MOTION to Intervene , filed by Intervenor Natalie R Lile. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Intervene)(Lile, Natalie)
August 28, 2013 Filing 56 SEALED- Notice to the Court regarding request for order c/s, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CBU)
August 28, 2013 Filing 55 SEALED COVER SHEET-for filing under seal of its notice to the Court regarding request for order c/s, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CBU)
August 28, 2013 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File its notice to the Court regarding request for order under seal c/s, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(CBU)
August 27, 2013 Filing 53 MOTION Requesting Status Conference, filed by Defendant TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maley, John)
August 23, 2013 Filing 52 MOTION to Seal Document #51 SEALED Document (Motion for Leave to File Its Notice to th Court Regarding its Position Under Seal), filed by Defendant TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maley, John)
August 23, 2013 Filing 51 SEALED Notice with Sealed Cover Sheet, filed by Defendant TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Document - Notice of Position)(Maley, John)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Seal Documents. The Notice Regarding Attorneys' Claims to Settlements Proceeds, Document Number 39 and Document Number 41, is hereby placed under seal. The Motion to Seal [Dkt. 40] is superseded by this motion; therefore, the motion [dkt. 40] is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 8/20/2013. (MAC)
August 19, 2013 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss and to reject Jones request for attnys claims to proceeds c/s, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CBU)
August 19, 2013 Filing 48 REDACTED DOCUMENT #36 NOTICE (Plaintiff's Notification to the Court in Regard to Representation - Redacted), filed by Defendant TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY (Maley, John) Modified on 8/20/2013 (CBU).
August 19, 2013 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney's Fee Charging Lien, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC (Goebel, J.)
August 18, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney's Fee Charging Lien, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC, Defendant TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY (Lile, Natalie)
August 18, 2013 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney's Fee Charging Lien, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC, Defendant TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY (Howard, Douglas)
August 16, 2013 Filing 44 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/16/2013 - Parties discussed Plaintiff Notice to the Court in regard to representation [Dkt. 36] and the status of settlement and closure of this matter. (See Entry for specific details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue.(REO)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Seal #36 NOTICE to the Court in regard to representation. Defendant's counsel shall file a redacted version of the letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 8/15/2013. (TMA)
August 15, 2013 Filing 42 Amended MOTION to Seal Document #40 MOTION to Seal Document, #41 Submission of Signature Requirement, #39 SEALED Document , filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Howard, Douglas)
August 15, 2013 Filing 41 **ORDERED SEALED PER #50 **Submission of Signature Requirement re #39 SEALED Document by VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Howard, Douglas) Modified on 8/21/2013 (MAC).
August 14, 2013 Filing 40 MOTION To Seal Notice Regarding Settlement Proceeds, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Howard, Douglas) Modified on 8/15/2013 (CBU).
August 14, 2013 Filing 39 **ORDERED SEALED PER #50 **SEALED Notice Regarding Settlement Agreement, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Howard, Douglas) Modified on 8/21/2013 (MAC).
August 14, 2013 Filing 38 MOTION to Seal Document #36 Notice (Other) (Defendant's Motion to Maintain the Seal of the Letter Filed by Plaintiff at Docket No. 36 In Part), filed by Defendant TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maley, John)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re #36 Notice, filed by VIRGINIA LEBLANC - The Clerk is directed to provisionally seal the notice [Dkt. 36]. Defendant's counsel shall file appropriate motion to maintain the seal of this document, if needed, within 7 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 8/13/2013. (TMA)
August 12, 2013 Filing 36 ***SEALED PER #37 ORDER OF 8/13/13 *** NOTICE to the Court in regard to representation, cc filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC (Attachments: # (1) Envelope) (CBU) Modified on 8/13/2013 (TMA).
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: The parties having notified the Court that this case settled, the Court hereby orders parties to file their Stipulation of Dismissal on or before SEPTEMBER 5, 2013. Any previously-ordered dates and deadlines are VACATED and any pending motions are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 7/23/2013.(SWM)
June 7, 2013 Filing 34 Witness List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Howard, Douglas)
June 7, 2013 Filing 33 Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Howard, Douglas)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER for Telephonic Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 6/4/2013 - Parties discussed case status and discovery. Plaintiff made oral motion for leave to belatedly file its preliminary exhibit and witness list. Defendant indicated no objection. Motion is GRANTED. These lists are to be filed by June 7, 2013. This Magistrate Judge advised counsel that after this conference she would speak privately with counsel for each party about that party's settlement position. The conference concluded without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue.(REO)
May 28, 2013 Filing 31 Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Defendant TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Maley, John)
May 28, 2013 Filing 30 Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Defendant TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Maley, John)
March 26, 2013 Filing 28 Amended ANSWER to Complaint , filed by TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY.(Maley, John)
March 12, 2013 Filing 27 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue: Settlement Conference held on 3/8/2013. Conference concluded without resolution. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/4/2013 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue. (TMA)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of Amos N. Jones on behalf of the pltf. Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 3/5/2013 (copies mailed to those not reg) (CBU)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Natalie R. Lile on behalf of the Pltf. Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 3/5/2013 (copy mailed to those not reg) (CBU)
March 1, 2013 Filing 24 RECEIPT #IP034489 in the amount of $ 30.00 phv fee of Amos N. Jones (CBU)
March 1, 2013 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney Amos N. Jones to Appear pro hac vice, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CBU)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/25/2013. This matter remains set for a settlement conference on March 8, 2013. The conference concluded without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue. (TMA) Modified on 2/28/2013 (TMA). c/m
February 27, 2013 Filing 22 RECEIPT #IP034449 in the amount of $ 30.00 PHV fee for Natalie Lile (CBU)
February 27, 2013 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney Natalie R. Lile to Appear pro hac vice., filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CBU)
February 6, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Anthony Goebel on behalf of Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Goebel, J.)
February 6, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C Howard on behalf of Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC. (Howard, Douglas)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 3/8/2013 09:00 AM in room #255, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 1/22/2013. (TMA) Modified on 1/22/2013 (TMA). c/m
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 9/26/2013. Discovery due by 8/26/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 1/22/2013. c/m (TMA)
January 22, 2013 Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/7/2013. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/25/2013 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue. c/m (TMA)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2014 02:00 PM in room #361, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street before Judge Larry J. McKinney. Jury Trial set for 4/21/2014 09:00 AM in room #349, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street before Judge Larry J. McKinney. Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 1/8/2013.(CBU)
December 31, 2012 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff VIRGINIA LEBLANC, Defendant TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY . (Maley, John)
November 19, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Larry J. McKinney. Judge Richard L. Young no longer assigned to the case. Please include the new case number, 1:12-cv-1574-LJM-DKL, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/19/2012. (PG)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2013 09:00 AM in room #255, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 11/15/2012. c/m (TMA)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Teresa L. Jakubowski withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 11/6/2012. (TMA) Modified on 11/7/2012 (TMA). c/m
November 6, 2012 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , filed by TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY.(Maley, John)
November 2, 2012 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance for Teresa Jakubowski, filed by Defendant TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maley, John)
November 1, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Ehrenberg, Jr on behalf of Defendant TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Ehrenberg, James)
November 1, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Maley on behalf of Defendant TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY. (Maley, John)
October 31, 2012 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Docket Sheet and Documents for Cause No. 8:12-cv-2162-JFM transferred from District of Maryland (Greenbelt). Docket Sheet is the main document. Documents are attached in the order as they appear on the docket sheet. Main document for each document number is 1-1 if attachments are included. Attachments are described as Doc 1-2, 1-3, etc. Documents were not attached or were unavailable/restricted for Document Nos. 5, 9, 10, 11, 12, and 13 (refer to the docket sheet). (Attachments: #1 Doc 1-1 complaint, #2 Doc 1-2 civil cover sheet, #3 Doc 1-3 Notice of Right to Sue, #4 Doc 2 Request for Waiver of Serivce, #5 Doc 3 Notice of Appearance by Teresa L. Jakubowski, #6 Doc 4-1 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John R. Maley, #7 Doc 6-1 Motion for Extension of Time filed by Defendant, #8 Doc 6-2 proposed order, #9 Doc 7-1 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff, #10 Doc 7-2 Affidavit in Support, #11 Doc 7-3 supplement -- proposed entry of default, #12 Doc 8-1 Response in Opposition to Motion (7) filed by Defendant, #13 Doc 8-2 text of proposed order, #14 Doc 14-1 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant, #15 Doc 14-2 Exhibit -- Memorandum, #16 Doc 14-3 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum -- McCourt Declaration, #17 Doc 14-4 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum -- letter from Maley to Jones, #18 Doc 15-1 Response in Opposition to Motion (14) filed by Plaintiff, #19 Doc 15-2 Exhibit A Evidence of Defendant's residency, #20 Doc 15-3 Exhibit B EEOC's Correspondence, #21 Doc 15-4 Affidavit, #22 Doc 16 Reply by Defendant in Support of Motion (14), #23 Doc 17 Reply by Plaintiff in Opposition to Motion (14), #24 Doc 18 Memorandum signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/23/12, #25 Doc 19 Order denying Motion to Dismiss (14); granting Motion to Transfer (15); and transferring this action to the Southern District of Indiana, #26 Doc 20-1 transfer letter, #27 Doc 20-2 USPS receipt) (DJH)
October 26, 2012 Filing 1 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:12-cv-2162-JFM. Certified copies of transfer order, memorandum and docket sheet received. (Attachments: #1 memorandum, #2 docket report, #3 transfer letter)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEBLANC v. TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. VIRGINIA LEBLANC
Represented By: J. Anthony Goebel
Represented By: Amos Nathanael Jones
Represented By: Natalie R. Lile
Represented By: Douglas C Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Douglas Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Natalie Lile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Amos N Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: J. Anthony Goebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Natalie R Lile
Represented By: Douglas C Howard
Represented By: Natalie R. Lile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TRUSTEES OF INDIANA UNIVERSITY
Represented By: James F. Ehrenberg, Jr.
Represented By: John R. Maley
Represented By: Teresa L. Jakubowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?