MENDEZ v. JACKSON COUNTY JAIL et al
Plaintiff: JACOB MENDEZ
Defendant: UNKNOWN JAIL OFFICIALS, JACKSON COUNTY JAIL, CHARLIE MURPHY and MARC A. LAHRMAN
Case Number: 1:2012cv01863
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CLOSED FINAL JUDGMENT: For the reasons detailed in the accompanying Order, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT. The action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/15/2014.(SWM)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - The defendants' motion to dismiss [dkt. 16 ] is denied as moot in light of the filing of the amended complaint on October 17, 2013. The plaintiff's motion to amend and/or supplement civil complaint [dkt. 20 ] is granted to th e extent that the proposed amended complaint has been screened. The proposed amended complaint is dismissed because it fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Mendez shall have through December 6, 2013, in which to file a second a mended complaint that complies with the guidelines provided in this Entry. If an amended complaint is filed, it will be screened. If no amended complaint is filed, the action will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/7/2013. (copy to Plaintiff via US Mail) (JKS)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTRY - Claims against the unknown jail officials are dismissed. Claims against the Jackson County Jail are dismissed as legally insufficient. No final judgment shall issue at this time as to the claims dismissed in this Entry. The clerk is des ignated to issue process on the defendants Marc A. Lahrman and Charlie Murphy in the manner specified by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d)(1). Process shall consist of the complaint, applicable forms and this Entry. ***SEE ENTRY***. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 2/19/2013. (copy to Plaintiff via US Mail) (JKS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENDEZ v. JACKSON COUNTY JAIL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN JAIL OFFICIALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKSON COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLIE MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARC A. LAHRMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB MENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?