THARP et al v. CATRON INTERIOR SYSTEMS, INC

Plaintiff: JOE COAR, INDIANA/KENTUCKY/OHIO REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS, DOUGLAS J. MCCARRON, WILLIAM NIX, DOUG ROBINSON and DAVID THARP
Defendant: CATRON INTERIOR SYSTEMS, INC
Case Number: 1:2012cv01870
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2017 106 Opinion or Order of the Court CLOSED JUDGMENT in favor of the Plaintiffs for an award of $122,042.98. Judgment is entered accordingly, and this action is TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/23/2017.(CBU)
December 12, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND MOTION TO STRIKE SURREPLY - For the foregoing reasons, the Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration (Filing No. 78 ) is set for hearing on Tuesday, February 21, 2017 at 10:00 a.m., at the Birch Bayh Fede ral Building and U.S. Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, Courtroom #344. Catron is granted leave to amend its Answer within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Entry to assert a counterclaim for setoff based on the market recovery fund grants, and the Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Catron's Surreply Brief is denied. (See Entry.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/12/2016.(JLS)
March 2, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY FOLLOWING DAMAGES HEARING - Catron is liable to the Plaintiffs for delinquent Union dues, contributions, deductions, interest, and liquidated damages in the amount of $6,399.48 and for delinquent contributions, interest, liquidated dama ges, and auditor fees in the amount of $111,340.67 for the period of January 1, 2011 through December 31, 2012, totaling $117,740.15. This amount of liability is offset by the amount owed to Catron under the market recovery fund grants, totaling $95,367.50. Therefore, Catron's total liability to the Plaintiffs for the period of January 1, 2011 through December 31, 2012 is $22,372.65. Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. §1132(g)(2), the Plaintiffs also are entitled to their reasonable attorney's fees and costs of this action. If these fees and costs are sought, the Plaintiffs must file an accounting of the fees and costs within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Final judgment will issue under separate order. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/3/2016.(JLS)
August 19, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/19/2015. (CBU)
October 15, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/15/2014. (CBU)
September 10, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 32 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying Catron's 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. It is hereby ordered that Catron grant plaintiffs' payroll auditor access to all records necessary to complete the audit. Within 30 days of the completed audit, the parties are ORDERED to file a status report with the Court containing the results of the audit. If necessary, the Court will address any delinquent contributions or deductions, fees, and costs within a reasonable time. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/10/2014. (CBU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THARP et al v. CATRON INTERIOR SYSTEMS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATRON INTERIOR SYSTEMS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE COAR
Represented By: Paul T. Berkowitz
Represented By: Thomas Edward Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA/KENTUCKY/OHIO REGIONAL COUNCIL OF CARPENTERS
Represented By: Paul T. Berkowitz
Represented By: Thomas Edward Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS J. MCCARRON
Represented By: Paul T. Berkowitz
Represented By: Thomas Edward Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM NIX
Represented By: Paul T. Berkowitz
Represented By: Thomas Edward Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUG ROBINSON
Represented By: Paul T. Berkowitz
Represented By: Thomas Edward Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID THARP
Represented By: Paul T. Berkowitz
Represented By: Thomas Edward Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?