HAMDAN v. INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH NORTH, LLC
Plaintiff: TALAL S. HAMDAN
Defendant: CLARIAN HEALTH NORTH, LLC, INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH NORTH, LLC and INDIANA UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL NORTH, INC.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00195
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: William T. Lawrence
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ENTRY ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 6/11/2015. (DW)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ENTRY ON VARIOUS MOTIONS. The Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Defendants' Proffered Expert, Gary Skoog, PhD (Dkt. No. 140) is GRANTED IN PART. Dr. Skoog's opinion that Dr. Hamdan's actions in this ca se were voluntary and made as a matter of personal preference is EXCLUDED. The Hospital's Motion to Exclude and Objection to Plaintiff's Proffered Experts (Dkt. No. 142) is DENIED. The Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply (Dkt. No. 167) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to docket Dr. Hamdan's surreply found at Dkt. No. 167-1. The Defendants' Motion for Clarification (Dkt. No. 154) is GRANTED to the extent noted above. By Monday, April 20, 2015, Dr. Ham dan shall file a Response to the Hospital's statute of limitations argument. The Hospital shall file a brief, explaining the interplay between 42 U.S.C. § 11111, 42 U.S.C. § 11112, and respondeat superior liability on or before M onday, April 20, 2015. Dr. Hamdan shall respond on or before Monday, April 27, 2015. In light of the additional briefing that is needed in this case, the Court, on its own motion, VACATES the May 1, 2015, final pretrial conference and June 1, 201 5, trial dates. The final pretrial conference is hereby rescheduled for Friday, June 5, 2015, at 12:00 p.m., and the trial is rescheduled for Tuesday, July 7, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. Both will be held in Room 202 of the Birch Bayh Federal Building and United States Courthouse located at 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. The parties are reminded of their pre-trial preparation deadlines contained in Dkt. No. 32. The May 1, 2015, at 1:00 p.m., date shall proceed as a status conference. Counsel are required to attend, out-of-state counsel may appear telephonically, and clients may appear if they so choose. The settlement conference with Magistrate Judge Dinsmore remains set for May 4, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 4/7/2015. (BGT)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ENTRY ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: For the foregoing reasons, the Hospital's motion for summary judgment (dkt. no. 98) is GRANTED IN PART as to Dr. Hamdan's defamation claim for re-publication to Dr. Kovacs. Dr. Hamdan's motion for partial summary judgment (dkt. no. 100) is DENIED ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/5/2014. (DW)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/24/2014. (CBU)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ENTRY ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS: The Plaintiff's motion for leave to file surreply is GRANTED. Dkt. No. 36. The Clerk is directed to docket the Plaintiff's exhibit 1 to docket number 36 as the Plaintiff's surreply. The Court has considered the Plaintiff's surreply in making its Entry. In addition, the Defendants' motion to stay discovery is DENIED AS MOOT. Dkt. No. 42. For the reasons set forth above, the Defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 6/28/2013. (DW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAMDAN v. INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH NORTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARIAN HEALTH NORTH, LLC
Represented By: Theresa Renee Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH NORTH, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Cassman
Represented By: Theresa Renee Parish
Represented By: Michael D. Marine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL NORTH, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Cassman
Represented By: Theresa Renee Parish
Represented By: Michael D. Marine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TALAL S. HAMDAN
Represented By: W. William Hodes
Represented By: Cassandra A. Kruse
Represented By: Robert E. Saint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?