TELAMON CORPORATION v. THE CHARTER OAK FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: TELAMON CORPORATION
Defendant: THE CHARTER OAK FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY and TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2013cv00382
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Young
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2016 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 249 Motion for Judgment on Pleadings (styled as a Motion to Dismiss). Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 4/11/2016. (TMD)
January 17, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Non-Party Paul Chamberlain International's 90 Motion for Protective Order (see Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/17/2014. (SWM)
August 20, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY denying Telamon's 42 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 8/20/2013. (PG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TELAMON CORPORATION v. THE CHARTER OAK FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TELAMON CORPORATION
Represented By: Jason Ross Barclay
Represented By: Kara Cleary
Represented By: Charles P. Edwards
Represented By: BACKER & BACKER, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHARTER OAK FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michele A. Chapnick
Represented By: Richard K. Shoultz
Represented By: Lewis S. Wooton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Christie M. Bird
Represented By: Julia Blackwell Gelinas
Represented By: Arthur N. Lambert
Represented By: Michael A. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?