TAYLOR v. BIGLARI et al
Plaintiff: CHAD R. TAYLOR
Defendant: SARDAR BIGLARI, BIGLARI HOLDINGS, INC., PHILLIP L. COOLEY, KENNETH R. COOPER, WILLIAM L. JOHNSON, JAMES P. MASTRIAN and RUTH J. PERSON
Case Number: 1:2013cv00891
Filed: June 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Presiding Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS - Plaintiff's failure to make demand on the BH board means that his derivative claims must be dismissed unless he can satisfy the Aronson test for demand futility as borrowed from Delaware by Ind iana law. Because none of Plaintiff's claims pass the Aronson test, Defendants' motion to dismiss on the basis of failure to make demand is accordingly GRANTED. Judgment in this consolidated action shall enter in favor of Defendants. **SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS**. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 3/18/2015.(MGG)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER ON PARTIES' DISCOVERY-REALTED MOTIONS - The Court hereby GRANTS in part and DENIES in part parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order [dkt. 82 ], DENIES Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Limiting Plaintiff' ;s Use of Information or Documents Produced in Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Nominal Defendant Biglari Holdings, Inc. [dkt. 59 ], GRANTS Defendants' Motion for Protective Order to Stay Discovery [d kt. 80 ], and DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents Withheld by Nominal Defendant Biglari Holdings, Inc. Under Claim of Privilege [dkts. 49 , 50 ]. As requested, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint within ten (10) days from the date of this Order, and the Defendants shall file their response within twenty-one (21) days of the filing of Plaintiff'sAmended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/28/2014. (JD)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/12/2013. (PGS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR v. BIGLARI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARDAR BIGLARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIGLARI HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP L. COOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH R. COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM L. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES P. MASTRIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUTH J. PERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD R. TAYLOR
Represented By: Louis Nathaniel Boyarsky
Represented By: Offer Korin
Represented By: Linda L. Vitone
Represented By: Avraham Noam Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?