BUNCH v. FRANK et al
Plaintiff: KRISTINE BUNCH
Defendant: BRYAN FRANK and JAMES SKAGGS
Case Number: 1:2014cv00438
Filed: March 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Denise K. LaRue
Presiding Judge: William T. Lawrence
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ENTRY ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 54(b) - This cause is before the Court on the Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) (Dkt. No. 72 ). The motion is fully briefed and t he Court, being duly advised, GRANTS the motion. Judgment in favor of the United States will be entered this date. The case shall proceed against the remaining Defendants. (See Entry.) Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 1/6/2017. (BRR)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ENTRY ON UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Accordingly, the United States' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED as to Bunch's claims against the United States ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 9/28/2016. (DW)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ENTRY ON UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: This cause is before the Court on the United States of America's Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 13 in Cause No. 1:15-cv-160-RLY-TAB (S.D. Ind. Filed Feb. 5, 2015)). Accordingly, the motion to dismiss is DENIED, and the Court hereby gives notice to Bunch that it will be considering the United States' alternative mo tion for summary judgment. As requested, the Court will allow Bunch time to conduct limited discovery into this issue and to properly respond. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to confer with each other and file a notice with the Court within fourteen days outlining an agreed-upon timeframe to conduct the necessary discovery and a suggested briefing schedule. If the parties cannot agree, they should request a conference with Magistrate Judge LaRue. The consolidated case re mains STAYED pending a ruling on the United States' motion. As such, the Court expects the parties to work together in an expeditious manner ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 6/29/2015.(DW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUNCH v. FRANK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTINE BUNCH
Represented By: John L. Stainthorp
Represented By: Jan Susler
Represented By: J. SAMUEL TENENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN FRANK
Represented By: Corinne T.W. Gilchrist
Represented By: Laura Ann Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES SKAGGS
Represented By: Corinne T.W. Gilchrist
Represented By: Laura Ann Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?