DIRECTV, LLC v. SPINA et al
Plaintiff: DIRECTV, LLC
Defendant: SPINA, VICTOR A SPINA, MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC. doing business as TEXAS CORRAL also known as SHELBYVILLE TEXAS CORRAL, WILLIAM SPINA, VICTOR A SPINA, JR., SHELBYVILLE TEXAS CORRAL and WILLIAM ANTHONY SPINA, JR.
Consolidated Defendant: T.C. OF MARTINSVILLE LLC Consolidated from case 1:15-cv-00105-TWP-TAB doing business as TEXAS CORRAL also known as MARTINSVILLE TEXAS CORRAL and MARTINSVILLE TEXAS CORRAL
Counter Claimant: MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00104
Filed: January 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2017 Filing 171 CLOSED DISMISSED - Dismissal with prejudice acknowledged, per Stipulation of Dismissal filed at dkt. #170 . The parties hereby dismiss this action in its entirety with prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/9/2017.(APD)
May 8, 2017 Filing 170 STIPULATION of Dismissal , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Hufnagel, Christopher)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER ON APRIL 24, 2017, TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - Parties appeared by counsel April 24, 2017, for a telephonic status conference. Settlement discussions were held and this case is settled. Therefore, any pending motions are denied as moot, and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are vacated. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 28 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER ON APRIL 10, 2017, TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - Parties appeared by counsel April 10, 2017, for a telephonic status conference. Discussion held regarding settlement and related matters. This cause is set for a telephonic status conference at 10 a.m. on April 24, 2017. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel, who shall call the Court at 317-229-3660. The purpose of this conference is to discuss settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #165 Motion for Continuance. Telephonic Pre-Motion Conference RESET for 4/10/2017 03:30 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall appear by counsel who shall contact the Court at 317-229-3660. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/20/2017.(SWM)
March 17, 2017 Filing 165 MOTION for Continuance of March 28, 2017 Telephonic Pre-Motion Conference, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hufnagel, Christopher)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #163 Motion to Restore Case to Court's active calendar and for a Pre- Motion Telephonic Conference. Pre-Motion Telephone Conference set for 3/28/2017 02:30 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall appear by counsel who shall contact the Court at 317-229-3660. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/16/2017.(SWM)
March 15, 2017 Filing 163 MOTION TO RESTORE CASE TO COURT'S ACTIVE CALENDAR AND FOR PRE-MOTION TELEPHONE CONFERENCE, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hufnagel, Christopher)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #161 Motion for Extension of Time to File stipulation of dismissal. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 2/13/2017. (SWM)
February 10, 2017 Filing 161 MOTION for Extension of Time to to file Stipulation of Dismissal in which to #160 OrderTerminate Deadlines and HearingsTerminate Motions , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hufnagel, Christopher)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER that the Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this matter. Accordingly, any pending motions are denied, without prejudice, as moot, and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are vacated. Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/11/2017.(CBU)
January 11, 2017 Filing 159 NOTICE of Settlement, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC (Lonstein, Julie)
January 5, 2017 Filing 158 Minute Entry - On January 5, 2017 the Court held a telephone conference. Plaintiff DirecTV, LLC ("DirecTV") was present by counsel Julie Lonstein and Christopher Hufnagel. Defendants Victor Spina, William Spina, and Martinsville Corral, Inc. were present by counsel Paul Overhauser. The Court Reporter was Jean Knepley. The telephone conference was originally to be the final pretrial conference, in preparation for the January 30, 2017 trial scheduled in this matter. At the outset of the conference, however, counsel advised that the parties are working diligently toward a possible settlement. The Court ORDERED counsel to advise the Courtroom Deputy, Michelle Imel, by 4:30 p.m. eastern time on January 5, 2017 of the status of settlement. Counsel reported progress is being made and they shall advise Ms. Imel on January 9, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. if settlement achieved. Counsel should contact Ms. Imel at 317-229-3670. If settlement is not achieved, the final pretrial conference will be re-set for a date during the week of January 9, 2017 by separate order. (GSO)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER - The Court DENIES Defendants' #119 Motion for Reconsideration. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/4/2017. (GSO)
December 30, 2016 Filing 156 Submission of Defendants' Case Synopsis, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
December 30, 2016 Filing 155 Submission of Proposed Verdict Form, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
December 30, 2016 Filing 154 RESPONSE in Opposition re #144 MOTION in Limine , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
December 30, 2016 Filing 153 RESPONSE in Objection to Defendants', re #146 Proposed Jury Instructions, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
December 30, 2016 Filing 152 OBJECTION to Defendants' Trial Witness and Exhibit Lists by DIRECTV, LLC. Related document: #143 Witness ListExhibit List filed by VICTOR A SPINA, MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., WILLIAM SPINA.(Lonstein, Julie)
December 30, 2016 Filing 151 Statement by Plaintiff of Case Synopsis by DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SEPARATION OF WITNESSES - Before the Court is Defendants' #147 Motion for Separation of Witnesses. The Court being advised, finds that the Motion should be, and hereby is GRANTED as to witnesses who are not named parties. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/29/2016. (GSO)
December 29, 2016 Filing 149 RESPONSE in Objection to Plaintiff's, re #140 Exhibit List, #141 Witness List, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR JANUARY 5, 2017 FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Considering the #139 Motion of the Plaintiff for an Order allowing for telephone appearance by all counsel for the Final Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for January 5, 2017, and good cause having been shown, It is hereby ORDERED, that all counsel shall be permitted to appear by telephone at the January 5, 2017 Final Pretrial Conference. Plaintiff is to initiate the call to the Court with all counsel on the line. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/28/2016. (GSO)
December 28, 2016 Filing 147 MOTION for Separation of Witnesses, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Overhauser, Paul)
December 23, 2016 Filing 146 Proposed Case-Specific Jury Instructions, filed by MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
December 23, 2016 Filing 145 Proposed Case-Specific Final Jury Instructions, filed by DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
December 23, 2016 Filing 144 MOTION in Limine , filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
December 23, 2016 Filing 143 Witness List for Trial, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA, Exhibit List for Trial, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
December 23, 2016 Filing 142 TRIAL BRIEF by MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
December 23, 2016 Filing 141 Witness List for Trial, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
December 23, 2016 Filing 140 Exhibit List for Trial, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
December 23, 2016 Filing 139 Unopposed MOTION for all counsel to Appear by Telephone at January 5, 2017 Final Pretrial Conference, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lonstein, Julie)
December 23, 2016 Filing 138 Proposed Voir Dire by MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
December 22, 2016 Filing 137 Submission of Depositions, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 30(b)(6) Deposition of Kent Mader, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Craig Spencer)(Overhauser, Paul)
December 21, 2016 Filing 136 NOTICE of Anticipated Use of Evidence Presentation Equipment, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA (Overhauser, Paul)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER - All claims against T.C. of Martinsville LLC are DISMISSED, and the Clerk is directed to TERMINATE T.C. of Martinsville LLC as a party in this matter. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/15/2016. (GSO)
December 15, 2016 Filing 134 REPORT in response to Order of Court, ECF#132, by DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER - The final pretrial conference in this action is scheduled for 1:00 p.m. on January 5, 2017 in Room 307, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, IN 46204. To facilitate the conference, and ultimately the trial, the Court now ORDERS as follows. To the extent that any instructions in this order conflict with those set forth in the case management plan, the instructions set forth in this order control. Copies of filings to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in MS Word form can be sent to Judge_Stinson_Chambers@insd.uscourts.gov. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/12/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Voir Dire, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Preliminary Instructions, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Final Instructions That Apply To All Claims)(GSO)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER - Trial in this matter is scheduled for January 30, 2017, and the Court requires clarification regarding whether DirecTV is still asserting claims against T.C., and the status of those claims. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the parties to file a Joint Report by December 16, 2016, setting forth their understanding of whether DirecTV is still asserting claims against T.C., and the status of those claims. Further, to the extent counsel for Victor Spina, William Spina, and Martinsville Corral, Inc. also intends to represent T.C. in this matter, counsel must enter an appearance by December 16, 2016. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/12/2016. (GSO)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER ON DECEMBER 2, 2016, TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - Parties appeared by counsel December 2, 2016, for a telephonic status conference. Discussion held regarding settlement. Attorney Paul Overhauser shall confer with his clients regarding settlement and promptly contact the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER ON NOVEMBER 28, 2016, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - Parties appeared in person and by counsel November 28, 2016, for a settlement conference. Settlement discussions held, but no settlement was reached. This cause is set for a telephonic status conference at 3:30 p.m. on December 2, 2016. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel, who shall call the Court at 317-229-3660. The purpose of this conference is to continue settlement discussion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 AMENDED ORDER re #127 Order on Motion for Continuance (marginal). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/21/2016.(CBU)
November 16, 2016 Filing 127 MARGINAL ENTRY entered re Plaintiff's #124 Motion for Continuance or to appear by telephone at 11/28/2016 settlement conference. Motion granted to the extent that out of town counsel/parties may appear by phone by calling the Court at 317-229-3660. Plaintiff's suggestion that travel burdens associated with the Thanksgiving holiday do not amount to good cause is not well taken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/16/2016. (SWM)
November 11, 2016 Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition re #124 MOTION for Continuance or to Appear by Telephone at the November 28, 2016 Settlement Conference , filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
November 10, 2016 Filing 125 REPLY in Support of Motion re #119 MOTION for Reconsideration re #115 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentOrder on Motion for Sanctions , filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ABA Article, Whos the Pirate? Lawyers Join Forces to Fight Questionable Claims of Pay-TV Theft, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Gabriela Padilla Rivera, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Dritan Zani,, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Marc Bragg, #5 Exhibit 5 - Depo. of Jaime Castillo, #6 Exhibit 6 - Class Action Third-Party Complaint against DirecTV)(Overhauser, Paul)
November 10, 2016 Filing 124 MOTION for Continuance or to Appear by Telephone at the November 28, 2016 Settlement Conference, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lonstein, Julie)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION - Before the Court is Defendants' #122 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply in Support of #119 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court being advised, finds that the Motion should be, and hereby is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to file a Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration is hereby enlarged to November 10, 2016. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/17/2016. (GSO)
October 14, 2016 Filing 122 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to November 10, 2016 in which to #119 MOTION for Reconsideration re #115 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentOrder on Motion for Sanctions file their Reply in Support of the Motion for Reconsideration #119 , filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Overhauser, Paul)
October 13, 2016 Filing 121 RESPONSE in Opposition re #119 MOTION for Reconsideration re #115 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentOrder on Motion for Sanctions , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER ON SEPTEMBER 26, 2016, TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES - Parties appeared by counsel September 26, 2016, for a telephonic status conference. Discussion held regarding discovery, settlement and related matters. The Magistrate Judge recommends that the District Judge set this matter for a 2-3 day jury trial in or after January 2017. This matter is set for a settlement conference at 9 a.m. on November 28, 2016, in Room 234, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. This is a global settlement conference, and the Court requests that counsel invite the counsel and parties from the state court declaratory judgment action to personally participate in the November 28 settlement conference. **SEE ORDER** Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
September 29, 2016 Filing 119 MOTION for Reconsideration re #115 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentOrder on Motion for Sanctions , filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
September 27, 2016 Filing 118 TRIAL SETTING AND NOTICE OF FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - This cause is hereby set for a Jury Trial before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on January 30, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. in Room 307 of the Birch Bayh Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. A Final Pretrial Conference is also set for January 5, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. in Room 307 of the Birch Bayh Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. Counsel are reminded of the required pretrial preparation deadlines set forth in paragraph VIII of the case management plan. Counsel are further reminded to review the undersigned's #6 Practices and Procedures. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/27/2016. (GSO)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER VACATING AND RESETTING CONFERENCE - The Court, on its own motion, vacates the telephonic status conference set for 2:30 p.m. on September 13, 2016, and resets this conference for 10 a.m. on September 26, 2016. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel, who shall call the Court at 317-229-3660. The purpose of this conference is to address case status and settlement in light of the Court's entry of August 30, 2016. [Docket No. 115.]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/12/2016.(MGG)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/13/2016 02:30 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel, who shall call the Court at 317-229-3660. The purpose of this conference is to address case status and settlement in light of the Court's entry of August 30, 2016. [Docket No. 115.] Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/31/2016.(SWM)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER - The Court DENIES Defendants' #103 Motion for Sanctions, finding that neither DirecTV nor its counsel engaged in any sanctionable conduct relating to the second deposition of DirecTV's Rule 30(b)(6) witness. The Court GRANTS IN PART DirecTV's #79 Motion for Summary Judgment, to the extent that it finds that MCI is liable as a matter of law for violating 605. The Court DENIES IN PART DirecTV's #79 Motion for Summary Judgment, to the extent that it finds that genuine issues of material fact preclude summary judgment on DirecTV's vicarious liability claim against Victor Spina and William Spina under 605. The Court DENIES IN ITS ENTIRETY Defendants' #106 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The claims remaining in this action are: (1) vicarious liability for violation of 47 U.S.C. 605 against Victor Spina and William Spina; and (2) violation of 18 U.S.C. 2511 against all Defendants. Additionally, the issue of what damages DirecTV is entitled to for MCI's violations of 47 U.S.C. 605 remains. The Court requests that the Magistrate Judge confer with the parties to address the possibility of an agreed resolution, or to establish a schedule for trial. No partial final judgment shall issue at this time. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/30/2016. (GSO) Modified on 8/31/2016 (GSO).
August 15, 2016 Filing 114 REPLY in Support of Motion re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment / Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER ON JULY 28, 2016, TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - Plaintiff appeared by counsel and Defendant appeared in person and by counsel July 28, 2016, for a telephonic status conference. Discussion held regarding settlement and related matters. Conference concluded without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
July 27, 2016 Filing 112 REPLY in Support of Motion re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response in Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
July 27, 2016 Filing 111 Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response in Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit September 25, 2015 Declaration of Craig Spencer, #2 Exhibit Excerpts of June 20, 2016 Deposition Transcript of Craig Spencer)(Lonstein, Julie)
July 15, 2016 Filing 110 REPLY in Support of Motion re #103 MOTION for Sanctions , filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
July 15, 2016 Filing 109 Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Reply in Support of Motion re #103 MOTION for Sanctions , filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Paul B. Overhauser, #2 Exhibit 2 - March 23 Email to Court, #3 Exhibit 3 - DirecTV Interrogatory Response)(Overhauser, Paul)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/28/2016 02:00 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel, who shall call the Court at 317-229-3660. The purpose of this conference is to address case status and settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/15/2016.(SWM)
July 5, 2016 Filing 107 RESPONSE in Opposition re #103 MOTION for Sanctions , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney Christopher J. Hufnagel and supporting exhibits)(Lonstein, Julie)
July 1, 2016 Filing 106 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
July 1, 2016 Filing 105 APPENDIX re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1Affidavit of William Spina, #2 Exhibit 2Affidavit of Victor Spina, Jr, #3 Exhibit 3Kent Mader Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 4Affidavit of Craig Spencer, #5 Exhibit 5DirecTV Interrogatory Answers Nos. 19-21, #6 Exhibit 6Deposition of Craig Spencer (6/20/2016), #7 Exhibit 7DirecTV Answers to Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit 8DirecTV Account Information for MCI Account, #9 Exhibit 9DirecTV Press Release Agreement with Denver International Airport, #10 Exhibit 10DirecTV Notice of Deposition)(Overhauser, Paul)
June 24, 2016 Filing 104 RESPONSE to #102 Report on Attorneys Fees and Costs Following this Court's Order Granting Motion to Strike and for Sanctions, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, and WILLIAM SPINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Spencer 6/20/16 Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - DirecTV 30(b)(6) Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3 - J. Lonstein / VFT Webpages, #4 Exhibit 4 - J. Lonstein Patent Application)(Overhauser, Paul) Modified on 6/28/2016 (GSO).
June 17, 2016 Filing 103 MOTION for Sanctions , filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition of DirecTV LLC, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition of DirecTV LLC, #3 Exhibit 3 - Renewed Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition of DirecTV LLC, #4 Exhibit 4 - Certificate of Non-Appearance - 30(b)(6) Deposition of DirecTV)(Overhauser, Paul)
June 17, 2016 Filing 102 REPORT ON ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FOLLOWING THIS COURTS ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE AND FOR SANCTIONS [Filing No. 101] by DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER - The Court OVERRULES Defendants' #97 Objection to Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and for Sanctions to the extent that it ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's #88 Report and Recommendation except for the basis for sanctions, which the Court finds are more properly imposed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(d)(2) rather than the Court's inherent power. The Court GRANTS DirecTV's #56 Motion to Strike and for Sanctions to the extent that absent an agreement by the parties to use portions of Mr. Spencer's deposition, Mr. Spencer's deposition is STRICKEN. The Court also GRANTS DirecTV's #56 Motion to Strike and for Sanctions to the extent that it finds DirecTV is entitled to its fees and costs in connection with the motion. The Court ORDERS that, within 14 days of the date of this Order, DirecTV shall either submit a Fee Petition, or shall file a Report advising that it is only seeking the fees and costs set forth in the Declaration of Attorney Christopher J. Hufnagel, [Filing No. 56-1]. Defendants shall have 7 days from the date of DirecTV's filing of a Fee Petition or Report to respond. No reply is necessary. The Court OVERRULES MCI's #98 Objection and Motion for Reconsideration of Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's #89 Report and Recommendation in full. The Court GRANTS DirecTV's #68 Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaim and DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE MCI's breach of contract counter-claim. As set forth in the Court's January 7, 2016 Order, the deadline for Defendants to file a Motion for Summary Judgment, and to file a response to DirecTV's Motion for Summary Judgment, is 30 days from the date of this Order. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/3/2016. (GSO)
April 14, 2016 Filing 100 RESPONSE to Defendants' Objections to Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
April 14, 2016 Filing 99 RESPONSE to Defendants' Objections to Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and For Sanctions, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
March 30, 2016 Filing 98 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC. re #89 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to ECF document #59, Amended Counterclaim filed by DIRECTV, LLC (Overhauser, Paul)
March 30, 2016 Filing 97 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by All Defendants re #88 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #56 MOTION to Strike deposition transcript of non-party witness Craig Spencer and MOTION for Sanctions filed by DIRECTV, LLC (Overhauser, Paul)
March 25, 2016 Filing 96 Witness List and Exhibit List, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
March 25, 2016 Filing 95 Exhibit List , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
March 25, 2016 Filing 94 Witness List , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER ON MARCH 24, 2016, TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - Parties appeared by counsel March 24, 2016, for a telephonic status conference. Discussion held regarding settlement and related matters. Conference concluded without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - This cause is set for a telephonic status conference at 2 p.m. on March 24, 2016. Counsel and their clients shall participate in this conference, who shall be connected to the conference line no later than 1:55 p.m. Information on how to access this conference call will be provided to counsel of record in a separate notice. The purpose of this conference is to address status of settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/23/2016.(MGG) Modified on 3/23/2016 (MGG). (Main Document 91 replaced on 3/23/2016) (MGG).
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER ON MARCH 17, 2016, TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - Parties appeared by counsel March 17, 2016, for a telephonic status conference. Discussion held regarding settlement and related matters. Defendant's counsel shall contact the Magistrate Judge by March 18, 2016, to provide an update on settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
March 16, 2016 Filing 89 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to ECF document #59, Amended Counterclaim filed by DIRECTV, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/16/2016.(SWM)
March 16, 2016 Filing 88 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #56 MOTION to Strike deposition transcript of non-party witness Craig Spencer and MOTION for Sanctions filed by DIRECTV, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/16/2016.(SWM)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - This cause is set for a telephonic status conference at 10:30 a.m. on March 17, 2016. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel, who shall call the Court at 317-229-3660. The purpose of this conference is to address case status and settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/11/2016.(MGG)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER ON JANUARY 26, 2016, TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - Parties appeared by counsel January 26, 2016, for a telephonic status conference. Discussion held regarding discovery, settlement, and related matters. The Court ordered Defendant to produce another representative for a follow-up Rule 30 (b)(6) deposition due to numerous deficiencies in the responses provided by the first Rule 30 (b)(6) deponent. The deposition shall be completed by February 16, 2016. Defendant's request for fees and costs in connection with this deposition is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting Defendants' #84 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The deadline for Defendants to file a Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby enlarged to the date that coincides with Defendants' deadline to file their Cross- Summary Judgment Motion, as calculated per this Court's Order of January 7, 2016 [#078]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 2/1/2016. (SWM)
January 25, 2016 Filing 84 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to coincide with deadline for Defendants to file cross-motion for summary judgment per Order of Jan. 7, 2016 re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Kent Mader: Unprepared Topics, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Overhauser, Paul)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - This cause is set for a telephonic status conference at 2:30 p.m. on January 26, 2016. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel, who shall call the Court at 317-229-3660. The purpose of this conference is to address a discovery dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/25/2016.(MGG)
January 14, 2016 Filing 82 Receipt of four compact disks re #81 NOTICE of manual filings by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (BGT)
January 8, 2016 Filing 81 NOTICE of manual filings, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC, re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Lonstein, Julie)
January 8, 2016 Filing 80 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #79 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
January 8, 2016 Filing 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Auditors Affidavit of the Martinsville Texas Corral audit on June 3, 2014, #3 Exhibit B - Video Disc of the Martinsville Texas Corral audit on June 3, 2014 (filed manually), #4 Exhibit C - Photographs of the Martinsville Texas Corral audit on June 3, 2014, #5 Exhibit D - Auditors Affidavit of the Shelbyville Texas Corral audit on June 4, 2014, #6 Exhibit E - Video Disc of the Shelbyville Texas Corral audit on June 4, 2014 (filed manually), #7 Exhibit F - Photographs of the Shelbyville Texas Corral audit on June 4, 2014, #8 Exhibit G - DIRECTV Account Records for Account Number 045448353 in the name of Victor Spina, #9 Exhibit H - Plaintiffs Affidavit in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #10 Exhibit I - Attorney Affidavit in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #11 Exhibit J - DIRECTVs March 30, 2015, discovery requests for Civil Action 1:15-cv-00104-JMS-TAB and Civil Action 1:15-cv-00105-TWP-TAB, #12 Exhibit K - Defendant Victor A. Spina, Jr.'s Responses to First Requests for Admission and Amended Reponses to First Requests for Admission (15-cv-104), #13 Exhibit L - Defendant William A. Spina's Responses to First Requests for Admission and Amended Responses to First Requests for Admission (15-cv-104), #14 Exhibit M - Defendant Martinsville Corral Inc.s Responses to First Requests for Admission and Amended Responses to First Requests for Admission (15-cv-104), #15 Exhibit N - Defendant Victor A. Spina, Jr.'s Responses to First Requests for Admission and Amended Responses to First Requests for Admission (15-cv-105), #16 Exhibit O - Defendant Victor A. Spina, Jr.s Responses to Interrogatories and Amended Responses to Interrogatories (15-cv-104), #17 Exhibit P - Defendant William A. Spinas Responses to Interrogatories and Amended Responses to Interrogatories (15-cv-104), #18 Exhibit Q - Defendant Martinsville Corral Inc.s Responses to Interrogatories and Amended Responses to Interrogatories (15-cv-104), #19 Exhibit R - Defendant Victor A. Spina, Jr.s Responses to Interrogatories and Amended Responses to Interrogatories (15-cv-105), #20 Exhibit S - Excerpts from Transcript of Deposition of Defendant Victor A. Spina, Jr., #21 Exhibit T - Excerpts from Transcript of Deposition of Defendant William A. Spina)(Lonstein, Julie)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants are allowed to file a motion for summary judgment 30 dyas after the earlier of :(a)DirecTV filing its answer to defendant, Martinsville Corral Inc's counterclaim or (b) the Court granting DirecTV's motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/7/2016. (CBU)
January 5, 2016 Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to thirty (30) days after the earlier of: (a) DirecTV filing its Answer to Defendant, Martinsville Corral, Inc.s Counterclaim; or (b) the Court granting DirecTVs Motion to Dismiss [#068] for Defendants to file Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email of Counsel, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed order)(Overhauser, Paul)
December 30, 2015 Filing 76 Statement of Claims by DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
December 29, 2015 Filing 75 Statement of Claims by All Defendants. (Overhauser, Paul)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER REFERRING MOTION. On November 23, 2015, Plaintiff/Counterclaim-Defendant DIRECTV, LLC, filed a Motion To Dismiss Amended Counterclaim [dkt. 68]. United States Magistrate Judge Tim Baker is hereby designated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) to conduct any necessary hearings and issue a report and recommendation regarding the proper disposition of Plaintiff/Counterclaim-Defendant DIRECTV, LLC's, Motion To Dismiss Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/18/2015. (BGT)
December 17, 2015 Filing 73 REPLY in Support of Motion re #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to ECF document #59, Amended Counterclaim , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
December 10, 2015 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to ECF document #59, Amended Counterclaim , filed by Counter Claimant MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC.. (Overhauser, Paul)
November 27, 2015 Filing 71 NOTICE of Objection to Expert Testimony of Directv, LLC, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA (Overhauser, Paul)
November 23, 2015 Filing 70 REPLY in Support of Motion re #56 MOTION to Strike deposition transcript of non-party witness Craig Spencer and MOTION for Sanctions , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
November 23, 2015 Filing 69 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to ECF document #59, Amended Counterclaim , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indiana Secretary of State Document, #2 Exhibit B - DIRECTV Customer Agreement)(Lonstein, Julie)
November 23, 2015 Filing 68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to ECF document #59, Amended Counterclaim, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lonstein, Julie)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ON NOVEMBER 20, 2015, TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - Parties appeared by counsel November 20, 2015, for a telephonic status conference. Discussion held regarding related matters. The deposition of Directv's executive vice president shall take place on December 15, 2015, and the liability discovery deadline is enlarged to that date. The Court declines to enlarge the summary judgment motion at this time, though for good cause a party may file a motion requesting a brief enlargement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SCHEDULING ORDER - This cause is set for a telephonic status conference at 11:30 a.m. on November 20, 2015. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel, who shall call the Court at 317-229- 3660. The purpose of this conference is to address a discovery dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/19/2015.(MGG)
November 16, 2015 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION to Strike deposition transcript of non-party witness Craig Spencer and MOTION for Sanctions , filed by Defendant MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Spencer Declaration dated June 4, 2015, #2 Exhibit 2 - Spencer Declaration dated September 25, 2015, #3 Exhibit 3 - Spencer Declaration dated November 16, 2015, #4 Exhibit 4 - Spencer Deposition, September 25, 2015, #5 Exhibit 5 - Overhauser Declaration)(Overhauser, Paul)
November 12, 2015 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne D. Lonstein on behalf of Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Wayne)
November 5, 2015 Filing 63 Defendants Victor A. Spina Jr. and William Spina ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA.(Overhauser, Paul)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DISCOVERY ORDER: Pending before the Court is a dispute involving the proper location of the deposition of Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) corporate representative. Plaintiff DirectTV argues the deposition of a Rule 30(b)(6) representative presumptively should occur at the company's principal place of business, which is El Segundo, California. Defendants counter that Plaintiff (and its officers) are required to make themselves available for deposition in the district in which Plaintiff brought suit. The Court overrules Plaintiff's objections and orders the deposition of Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) representative to occur in Indianapolis at a time mutually convenient for the parties and their counsel. In this regard, the Court adds that, inexplicably, Defendants served a notice of deposition for this Rule 30(b)(6) deposition while the Court had the dispute as to the deposition's proper location under consideration. Serving a notice of deposition under these circumstances was improper at best. That deposition notice is quashed (see Order for additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/5/2015.(SWM)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER - Plaintiff and Defendant appeared in person and by counsel October 29, 2015, for a settlement conference. Settlement discussions held, but no settlement was reached. Conference concluded without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REFERRING MOTION. On October 28, 2015, Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC, filed a Motion To Strike and For Sanctions [dkt. 56]. United States Magistrate Judge Tim Baker is hereby designated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) to conduct any necessary hearings and issue a report and recommendation regarding the proper disposition of Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC's Motion To Strike and For Sanctions. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/2/2015. Motions referred to Tim A. Baker. (BGT)
November 2, 2015 Filing 59 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against DIRECTV, LLC, filed by MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC.(SWM)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting Defendant Martinsville Corral Inc's #47 Motion for Leave to File Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/2/2015. (SWM)
October 28, 2015 Filing 57 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #56 MOTION to Strike deposition transcript of non-party witness Craig Spencer and MOTION for Sanctions , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
October 28, 2015 Filing 56 MOTION to Strike deposition transcript of non-party witness Craig Spencer and, MOTION for Sanctions , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Attorney Christopher J. Hufnagel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lonstein, Julie)
October 20, 2015 Filing 55 REPLY in Support of Motion re #47 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim , filed by Defendant MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Craig Spencer dated September 25, 2015, #2 ***STRICKEN per #101 Order*** Exhibit 2 - Excerpts - Deposition of Craig Spencer)(Overhauser, Paul) Modified on 6/3/2016 (GSO).
October 14, 2015 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #51 Motion to excuse a representative from appearing in person at the Settlement Conference. Party representative is to appear at the October 29, 2015 Settlement Conference by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/13/2015. (SWM)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: On December 10, 2013, this Court revised its Uniform Case Management Plan for Civil Cases to include Section II.D, which provides as follows: Within 14 days after the non-expert discovery deadline, and consistent with the certification provisions of Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 11(b) the party with the burden of proof shall file a statement of the claims or defenses it intends to prove at trial, stating specifically the legal theories upon which the claims or defenses are based. See #Southern District of Indiana website. If the Case Management Plan in the above-captioned case does not include Section II.D as quoted above, the Court AMENDS the parties' Case Management Plan to include Section II.D and the parties shall file the appropriate statement. If the Case Management Plan in the above-captioned case already includes Section II.D as quoted above, the Court REMINDS the parties of their obligation to file the appropriate statement. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/13/2015. (BGT)
October 9, 2015 Filing 51 Amended MOTION to Excuse Plaintiff's Representative From Appearing At Settlement Conference In Person and Request For Plaintiff's Representative to Appear By Telephone or Video Conference, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lonstein, Julie)
October 9, 2015 Filing 50 MOTION to Excuse Plaintiff's Representative From Appearing At Settlement Conference In Person and Request For Plaintiff's Representative to Appear By Telephone, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lonstein, Julie)
October 1, 2015 Filing 49 NOTICE of intent to respond in opposition, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC, re #47 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim. (Lonstein, Julie)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker: Parties appeared by counsel September 29, 2015, for a telephonic status conference. This matter is set for a settlement conference at 1:30 p.m. on October 29, 2015, in Room 234, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Copy Mailed **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG) Modified on 10/1/2015 (MGG). (Main Document 48 replaced on 10/1/2015) (MGG).
September 30, 2015 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim, filed by Defendant MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendant, MCI's First Amended Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Overhauser, Paul)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Christopher J. Hufnagel for DIRECTV, LLC added. Copy to Christopher J. Hufnagel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/29/2015. (SWM)
September 28, 2015 Filing 45 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher J. Hufnagel to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $30, receipt number 0756-3617523), filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Christopher J. Hufnagel, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lonstein, Julie)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SCHEDULING ORDER: This cause is set for a telephonic status conference at 2:00 p.m. on September 29, 2015. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel, who shall call the Court at 317-229-3660. The purpose of this conference is to address a discovery dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/28/2015.(MGG)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADOPTING #42 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Magistrate Judge submitted his Report and Recommendation on two pending motions to dismiss. Defendants Victor and William Spinas' motion to dismiss [Filing Nos. 15, 35] be granted in part and denied in part, such that DirecTV's conversion claim should be dismissed and the interception claim should proceed forward. As to DirecTV's motion to dismiss MCI's counterclaims [Filing No. 22] the Magistrate Judge recommended that the motion should be granted. MCI's tortious interference with business relationship and abuse of process claims should be dismissed with prejudice. MCI's breach of contract claim should be dismissed without prejudice. The parties were afforded due opportunity pursuant to statute and the rules of this Court to file objections; none were filed. The Court, having considered the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, hereby adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/27/2015. (BGT)
August 11, 2015 Filing 42 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFFS COUNTERCLAIMS IN THEIR ENTIRETY filed by DIRECTV, LLC, #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by VICTOR A SPINA, MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC. and WILLIAM SPINA. This entry is being amended to substitute the word "granted" for "dismissed" on page 8, at the conclusion of the discussion on the tortious interference with business relationship claim. The purpose of this amendment is to clarify the wording, not to substantively change the entry. As a result, the 14-day objection period should not be extended. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/11/2015.(SWM)
August 5, 2015 Filing 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFFS COUNTERCLAIMS IN THEIR ENTIRETY filed by DIRECTV, LLC, #35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by VICTOR A SPINA AND, #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by VICTOR A SPINA, MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC. and WILLIAM SPINA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/5/2015.(SWM)
July 27, 2015 Filing 40 Witness List Preliminary, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA, Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
July 22, 2015 Filing 39 Witness List - preliminary, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
July 22, 2015 Filing 38 Exhibit List - preliminary, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. On July 6, 2015, the Court consolidated Cause No. 1:15-cv-00105-TWP-TAB into this action. The Court directs the Clerk to re-docket the pending motion to dismiss and the related filings from Cause No. 1:15-cv-00105-TWP-TAB (Filing No. 10; Filing No. 11: Filing No. 12) in this action and reopen that motion to dismiss as pending on the Court's docket. An Order Referring Motion had previously been entered referring that motion to United States Magistrate Tim A. Baker pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) to issue a report and recommendation, and that Order remains in effect. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 7/15/2015. (BGT) Modified on 7/15/2015 (BGT).
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. The parties have filed their responses, [Filing No. 31; Filing No. 32], to the portion of the Case Management Plan in which the Court ordered the parties to show cause why this case should not be consolidated with Cause No. 1:15-cv-105-TWP-TAB, [Filing No. 30 at 13]. The parties' responses represent their consent to the consolidation of the two actions at issue. [Filing No. 31; Filing No. 32.] Therefore, the Court ORDERS Cause No. 1:15-cv-105-TWP-TAB CONSOLIDATED with Cause No. 1:15-cv-104-JMS-TAB for all future proceedings. All future filings should bear Cause No. 1:15-cv-104-JMS-TAB. The Court directs the Clerk to also docket this Order in Cause No. 1:15-cv-105-TWP-TAB and close that case. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 7/6/2015. (BGT)
June 29, 2015 Filing 32 RETURN TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, re #30 Order: Case ManagementScheduling Order, filed by MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA.. (Overhauser, Paul)
June 25, 2015 Filing 31 RETURN TO #30 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, filed by DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie) Modified on 6/26/2015 (BGT).
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Parties appeared by counsel on 6/12/2015 for an Initial Pretrial Conference. Dispositive Motions due by 1/26/2016. Discovery due by 11/26/2015. The parties shall show cause, if any, why this case should not be consolidate with Cause No. 1:15-cv-0105-TWP-TAB for pretrial matters or, alternatively, for all purposes including trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/24/2015.(SWM)
June 11, 2015 Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter dated May 13, 2015, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email messages between counsel)(Lonstein, Julie)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS for Report and Recommendation: #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFFS COUNTERCLAIMS IN THEIR ENTIRETY filed by DIRECTV, LLC, and #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by VICTOR A SPINA, MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., WILLIAM SPINA. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/19/2015. Motions referred to Tim A. Baker.(SWM)
May 18, 2015 Filing 27 REPLY in Support of Motion re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFFS COUNTERCLAIMS IN THEIR ENTIRETY , filed by Counter Defendant DIRECTV, LLC, Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
May 12, 2015 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFFS COUNTERCLAIMS IN THEIR ENTIRETY , filed by Defendant MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC.. (Overhauser, Paul)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Defendants' #24 Motion to Continue the Initial Pretrial Conference. The Initial Pretrial Conference set for June 4, 2015 is vacated and reset for June 12, 2015 at 11:30 am in Room 234, Birch Bayh Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/30/2015. (BGT)
April 29, 2015 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pre-Trial Conference [Doc. 21], filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Overhauser, Paul)
April 29, 2015 Filing 23 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFFS COUNTERCLAIMS IN THEIR ENTIRETY , filed by Counter Defendant DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DIRECTV Customer Agreement)(Lonstein, Julie)
April 28, 2015 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFFS COUNTERCLAIMS IN THEIR ENTIRETY, filed by Counter Defendant DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum - DIRECTV Customer Agreement, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lonstein, Julie)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2015 09:30 AM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The parties shall file the proposed CMP no less than seven days prior to the pretrial conference (see Order for additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/27/2015.(SWM)
April 24, 2015 Filing 37 REPLY in Support of Motion re #35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by Defendant VICTOR A SPINA. ***Reply docketed per Dkt. #34 Order. Motion originally docketed in case 1:15-cv-00105-TWP-TAB at Dkt. No. #12 .*** (BGT)
April 24, 2015 Filing 20 REPLY in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
April 22, 2015 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. ***Response docketed per Dkt. #34 Order. Response originally docketed in case 1:15-cv-00105-TWP-TAB at Dkt. No. #11 .*** (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in J&J Sports Productions v. Mayreal II, LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint in J&J Sports Productions v. Mayreal II, LLC) (BGT)
April 22, 2015 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint for J&J v. Mayreal II LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint for J&J v Mayreal II LLC)(Lonstein, Julie)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying Parties' #17 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery. Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(b), only a notice is required, not a motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/16/2015. (BGT)
April 15, 2015 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Plaintiff to respond to discovery is by April 27, 2015 and May 15, 2015, respectively; and Defendants to respond to discovery is by May 16, 2015 , filed by Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
April 8, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, filed by Defendant VICTOR A SPINA. ***Motion docketed per Dkt. #34 Order. Motion originally docketed in case 1:15-cv-00105-TWP-TAB at Dkt. No. #10 .*** (Attachments: #1 J&J Sports v. Mayreal II, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Case 11-3345 (MD, February 1, 2012)) (BGT)
April 8, 2015 Filing 16 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint Afffirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against DIRECTV, LLC, filed by MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC..(Overhauser, Paul)
April 8, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - J&J Sports v. Mayreal II, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Case 11-3345 (MD, February 1, 2012))(Overhauser, Paul)
March 5, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
March 5, 2015 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC.. (Overhauser, Paul)
March 5, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B. Overhauser on behalf of Defendants MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA, WILLIAM SPINA. (Overhauser, Paul)
February 25, 2015 Filing 11 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by DIRECTV, LLC. MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC. served on 2/19/2015. (Lonstein, Julie)
February 25, 2015 Filing 10 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by DIRECTV, LLC. WILLIAM SPINA served on 2/19/2015. (Lonstein, Julie)
February 25, 2015 Filing 9 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by DIRECTV, LLC. VICTOR A SPINA served on 2/18/2015. (Lonstein, Julie)
February 9, 2015 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC. and WILLIAM SPINA. (BGT)
February 6, 2015 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DIRECTV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Lonstein, Julie)
January 28, 2015 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (BGT)
January 27, 2015 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
January 27, 2015 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC., VICTOR A SPINA. (DJH)
January 26, 2015 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DIRECTV, LLC identifying Corporate Parent THE DIRECTV GROUP, INC., Corporate Parent DIRECTV HOLDINGS LLC for DIRECTV, LLC.. (Lonstein, Julie)
January 26, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Cohen Lonstein on behalf of Plaintiff DIRECTV, LLC. (Lonstein, Julie)
January 26, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DIRECTV, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-3328852) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Lonstein, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIRECTV, LLC v. SPINA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIRECTV, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Hufnagel
Represented By: Wayne D. Lonstein
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTOR A SPINA
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC. doing business as TEXAS CORRAL also known as SHELBYVILLE TEXAS CORRAL
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM SPINA
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTOR A SPINA, JR.
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELBYVILLE TEXAS CORRAL
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM ANTHONY SPINA, JR.
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: T.C. OF MARTINSVILLE LLC Consolidated from case 1:15-cv-00105-TWP-TAB doing business as TEXAS CORRAL also known as MARTINSVILLE TEXAS CORRAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: MARTINSVILLE TEXAS CORRAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: MARTINSVILLE CORRAL, INC.
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?