HOWE v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION et al
Plaintiff: |
ADAM ANTHONY HOWE |
Defendant: |
CORIZON MEDICAL DEPARTMENT FOR IDOC, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION, BRUCE LEMMON, MIKE PENCE and ZANTACKY |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00771 |
Filed: |
May 14, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Denise K. LaRue |
Presiding Judge: |
William T. Lawrence |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 13, 2016 |
Filing
31
Entry Discussing Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Opposition and Directing Entry of Final Judgment - For the reasons explained in this Entry, the defendant's motion for summary judgment [dkt. 24 ] is granted. Defendant Nurse Hoover is entitled to summary judgment on Mr. Howe's claims of deliberate indifference to a serious medical need. Accordingly, the defendant's motion for summary judgment [dkt. 24 ] is granted. Judgment consistent with this Entry and the Entry of October 30, 2015, shall now issue. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 12/13/2016. (RSF)
|
October 1, 2015 |
Filing
16
ENTRY Dismissing Amended Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings: For the reasons discussed above, the complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. The plaintiff shall have through October 30, 2015, in which to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/1/2015. (DW)
|
June 10, 2015 |
Filing
7
ENTRY Dismissing Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings: For the reasons discussed above, the complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. The plaintiff shall h ave through July 13, 2015, in which to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Luevano v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., 722 F.3d 1014, 1022 (7th Cir. 2013) (plaintiffs should be given at least an opportunity to amend or to respond to an order to show cause before a case is "tossed out of court without giving the applicant any timely notice or opportunity to be heard to clarify, contest, or simply request leave to amend."). If Mr. Howe fails to show cause or seek leave to amend, the action will be dismissed for the reasons set forth in this Entry ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 6/10/2015. Copy sent via US Mail.(DW)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?