STROMINGER v. IDOC et al
Plaintiff: RAYMOND STROMINGER
Defendant: C. CONLON, CORIZON, G. EATON, J. HENDRIX, L. HOEFLING, IDOC, B. KIRTON, J. LYTLE, A. MCCULLOGH, C. NICHOLSON, L. PETTY, J. SAFFORD, J. SNYDER and D. THOMPSON
Case Number: 1:2015cv01654
Filed: October 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ENTRY - 48 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. 92 Motion to Strike the Defendants' Supplemental Reply is granted to the extent that the Court has not relied on the Defendants' filing of August 23, 2017, in reaching its decision in this case. Judgment consistent with this Entry and with the Entry of January 27, 2016, dkt. 11 , shall now issue. See entry for details. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/25/2017. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (MEJ)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Marginal Notation Approves 78 Notice of Substitution of Appearance filed by IDOC, C. NICHOLSON, Attorney Brian Lee Park terminated. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/28/2017.(JLS)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ENTRY - For these reasons, the defendants' motion for leave to amend answer [dkt. 46] is denied. **SEE ORDER** Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/11/2016. (JLS)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Entry Denying Motion to Reconsider and Motion to Appoint Counsel - The plaintiff's motion to reconsider, brought under Rule 59(e) [dkt. 14] is denied. The plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel [dkt. 15] is denied as premature . The Clerk is directed to include a form motion for assistance recruiting counsel along with the plaintiff's copy of this Entry. If the plaintiff files this form after the defendants appear and answer the amended complaint, the Court will reconsider the plaintiff's request.(See order). Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/8/2016. (JLS)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENTRY Screening Amended Complaint, Dismissing and Severing Certain Claims,and Directing Service of Process - Any claims for injunctive relief are dismissed as moot because the plaintiff is no longer confined at Wabash Valley. Claims 6 and 7 are sever ed from the amended complaint. The claims in the newly- opened actions are distinct from the claims in this action. This action, docketed as No. 1:15-cv-01654-TWP-DML shall proceed as to Claim 1, asserted against defendants Indiana Department of Co rrection and Lt. Nicholson. All other claims against all other defendants are dismissed from this action without prejudice. The clerk is designated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c) to issue process to defendants Indiana Department of Correction a nd Lt. C. Nicholson in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the amended complaint filed on November 19, 2015 (docket 5), applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. (See order for further information). Copies to Plaintiff and Defendants via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/27/2016. (JLS)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Entry Discussing Amended Complaint And Directing Plaintiff to Report on Misjoined Claims - The plaintiff shall have through January 25, 2016, in which to notify the Court 1) which claim he wishes to be considered in this case, 1:15-cv-1654-TWP-DML , and 2) which claims, if any, he wishes the Court to sever into new actions. If the plaintiff fails to so notify the Court, the Court will determine which single claim will be considered in this case, will screen that claim, and then the remaini ng misjoined claims will be considered abandoned and will be dismissed without prejudice.The plaintiff's motion requesting a stamped copy of his amended complaint [dkt. 6] is granted. The clerk shall include a copy of the file-stamped copy of the amended complaint (docket 5) with the plaintiff's copy of this Entry. Copy to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/28/2015. (JLS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STROMINGER v. IDOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. CONLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORIZON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. EATON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. HENDRIX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. HOEFLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. KIRTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. LYTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. MCCULLOGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. NICHOLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. PETTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. SAFFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. SNYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND STROMINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?