HARGROVE v. COLVIN
Plaintiff: JOSHUA HARGROVE
Defendant: CAROLYN W. COLVIN
Miscellaneous: SSA (Court Use Only) and USM (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2016cv01922
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - 24 Motion for Attorney Fees is granted in part. The Court ORDERS the Commissioner to make this payment to The de la Torre Law Office LLC within seventy (70) days from the date of this Order, as requested by Hargrove. If within seventy days of the date of this Order the Commissioner finds evidence that Hargrove owes an outstanding debt to the U.S. Government, the Commissioner may reduce the award by the amount of the debt owed. See order for details. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/12/2018. (MEJ)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED and REMANDED to the Agency for further proceedings, as authorized by sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g).Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/25/2017. (MEJ)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENTRY ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERSIZE BRIEF - Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Oversize Brief (Filing No. 15 ) is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. Plaintiff's 45 page limit brief is due by December 28, 2016 and the response and reply deadlines are extended accordingly. (See Entry.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/9/2016. (JLS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARGROVE v. COLVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLYN W. COLVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA HARGROVE
Represented By: Adriana Maria de la Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: USM (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?