STRAW v. INDIANA SUPREME COURT et al
Plaintiff: ANDREW U.D. STRAW
Defendant: JAMES ROBERT AHLER, INDIANA SUPREME COURT, LILIA G. JUDSON, BRENDA RODEHEFFER, LORETTA H. RUSH and G. MICHAEL WITTE
Case Number: 1:2016cv03483
Filed: December 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER - Mr. Straw's writ of certiorari seeking review of the Seventh Circuit's ruling was denied by the United States Supreme Court on January 11, 2018. Mr. Straw has shown no legally sufficient reason for his not being banned from making further post-judgment filings in this closed case, our prior order(s) stand. He is accordingly hereby PROHIBITED from filing any papers in this cause other than a possible appeal of this order to the Court of Appeals. Any future filings submitted ei ther directly or indirectly by or on behalf of Mr. Straw in this case in violation of this order shall not be accepted by the Clerk, who is directed to return them unfiled. Any papers filed electronically will be stricken. The filings made by Mr. Straw in this case between April 16, 2018 and the date of this entry will not be reviewed by the Court for the same reasons explained. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/11/2018. Copy Mailed. (CKM)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER - For reasons stated in this order, the Court DENIES Mr. Straw's Motion for Declaratory Judgment, 37 , and concludes that Mr. Straw has failed to show cause why the Court should not enter final judgment in favor of Defendants on his claims. Thus, final judgment shall enter accordingly. SEE ORDER. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 2/16/2017. (JRB)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - The Court GRANTS Mr. Straw's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Reply Brief, 26 , although in the future he will have only one chance to submit any filing and supplements will not be allowed. For the reasons stated herein, the Cour t DENIES Mr. Straw's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. 2 . Because the Court has found that the Younger abstention doctrine applies, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Mr. Straw's claims to the extent he asks this Court to intervene in or review the disciplinary proceedings currently pending against him before the Indiana Supreme Court. Given that halting those proceedings seems to be the thrust of Mr. Straw's action, as evidenced by his injunction request filed the same day as his Complaint, the Court ORDERS Mr. Straw to SHOW CAUSE by February 3, 2017, why final judgment should not enter and this case be closed. Defendants will have ten days from Mr. Straw's response to this show cause order to file a response brie f. Mr. Straw will have seven days from the date of that filing to file a reply brief. No additional filings will be allowed, and neither party will be allowed to amend or supplement the initial briefs filed. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/23/2017. (JRB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRAW v. INDIANA SUPREME COURT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES ROBERT AHLER
Represented By: Betsy M. Isenberg
Represented By: Rebecca L. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA SUPREME COURT
Represented By: Betsy M. Isenberg
Represented By: Rebecca L. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LILIA G. JUDSON
Represented By: Betsy M. Isenberg
Represented By: Rebecca L. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENDA RODEHEFFER
Represented By: Betsy M. Isenberg
Represented By: Rebecca L. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORETTA H. RUSH
Represented By: Betsy M. Isenberg
Represented By: Rebecca L. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. MICHAEL WITTE
Represented By: Betsy M. Isenberg
Represented By: Rebecca L. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW U.D. STRAW
Represented By: Andrew U. D. Straw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?