COMMON CAUSE INDIANA et al v. MARION COUNTY ELECTION BOARD et al
Plaintiff: COMMON CAUSE INDIANA, DORIS A MCDOUGAL, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE and JOHN WINDLE
Defendant: MYRA A ELDRIDGE, MAURA HOFF, KEITH JOHNSON, CONNIE LAWSON and MARION COUNTY ELECTION BOARD
Case Number: 1:2017cv01388
Filed: May 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 106 Parties Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling. ***SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS*** Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 2/5/2019. (LDH)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER - denying 89 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment *** SEE ORDER ***. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/9/2018. (CKM)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 OPINION AND ORDER - ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DKTS. 61, 67); We DENY 61 Plaintiffs' motion as it relates to the May 2018 primary election. We GRANT Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction as it relates to the November 2018 general election. The injunction will issue by separate order. We DENY 67 the State's motion to file a brief as amicus curiae. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 4/25/2018. (CKM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMON CAUSE INDIANA et al v. MARION COUNTY ELECTION BOARD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMON CAUSE INDIANA
Represented By: Daniel Bowman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORIS A MCDOUGAL
Represented By: Daniel Bowman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE
Represented By: Daniel Bowman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN WINDLE
Represented By: Daniel Bowman
Represented By: William R. Groth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYRA A ELDRIDGE
Represented By: Anthony Scott Chinn
Represented By: Donald Eugene Morgan
Represented By: Daniel E. Pulliam
Represented By: Anne Kramer Ricchiuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAURA HOFF
Represented By: Anthony Scott Chinn
Represented By: Donald Eugene Morgan
Represented By: Daniel E. Pulliam
Represented By: Anne Kramer Ricchiuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH JOHNSON
Represented By: Anthony Scott Chinn
Represented By: Donald Eugene Morgan
Represented By: Daniel E. Pulliam
Represented By: Anne Kramer Ricchiuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE LAWSON
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Jessica Reagan Gastineau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION COUNTY ELECTION BOARD
Represented By: Anthony Scott Chinn
Represented By: Donald Eugene Morgan
Represented By: Daniel E. Pulliam
Represented By: Anne Kramer Ricchiuto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?