BARNES v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY A. BARNES
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., FORUM CREDIT UNION, FIFTH THIRD BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC and STAR FINANCIAL BANK
Case Number: 1:2017cv02874
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Plaintiff, Kimberly A. Barnes, by counsel has moved this court to dismiss this cause of action. The Court now GRANTS said Motion. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. This matter is now concluded in its entirety. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/8/2018.(APD)
January 5, 2018 Filing 58 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohron, Travis)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Granting #56 Motion to Dismiss Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC only are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/20/2017.(APD)
December 18, 2017 Filing 56 STIPULATION of Dismissal re Equifax Information Services, LLC only, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohron, Travis)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT FORUM CREDIT UNION - Granting #53 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Forum Credit Union only are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/6/2017. (APD)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF DOCUMENTS AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL: Plaintiff has filed #53 Motion to Dismiss remaining Defendant Forum Credit Union. Therefore, all previously ordered dates are hereby VACATED, including the telephonic Status Conference set for 12/5/2017 at 11:00 A.M. (Eastern). *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/5/2017. (GD)
December 5, 2017 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Forum Credit Union, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohron, Travis)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA terminated. Plaintiff, Kimberly A. Barnes, by counsel has moved this court to dismiss all claims against Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A. ("Chase") (incorrectly named herein as "JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA") ONLY from this cause. The Court grants this motion. All of Plaintiff's claims against Chase, and ONLY Chase, are hereby dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. The Clerk is instructed to terminate Chase Bank USA, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA as parties from this matter. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/13/2017.(APD)
November 8, 2017 Filing 50 STIPULATION of Dismissal re JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA only, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohron, Travis)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF DOCUMENTS AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL: The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action ONLY as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Therefore, all pending motions with regard to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED only to the extent they relate to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Within sixty (60) days of the date of this entry, counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause ONLY as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/6/2017.(SWM)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF DOCUMENTS AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL: The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action ONLY as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Therefore, all pending motions with regard to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED only to the extent they relate to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Within sixty (60) days of the date of this entry, counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause ONLY as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/3/2017.(SWM)
November 3, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE of Settlement re Experian Information Solutions, Inc., filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES (Cohron, Travis)
November 2, 2017 Filing 46 NOTICE of Settlement re Equifax Information Services LLC, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES (Cohron, Travis)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The Court finds that the #44 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant STAR FINANCIAL BANK should be granted. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Star Financial Bank ONLY are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/2/2017.(APD)
November 1, 2017 Filing 44 STIPULATION of Dismissal re Star Financial Bank, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohron, Travis)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED by this Court that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Fifth Third Bank ONLY are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/31/2017.(JRB)
October 31, 2017 Filing 42 RESPONSE , re #40 Order to Show Cause, filed by Defendant FORUM CREDIT UNION. (Ruberry, Patrick)
October 27, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of Dismissal of Fifth Third Bank only, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cohron, Travis)
October 22, 2017 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(Peterson, Misty)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Counsel for Defendant Forum Credit Union, Patrick J. Ruberry and Phillip G. Litchfield, are hereby ordered to show cause why they failed to appear telephonically for the October 19, 2017 telephonic initial pretrial conference, Dkt. #26 in this matter. Counsel shall have through and including, October 31, 2017 to respond to this order. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/20/2017.(SWM)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 9/14/2018. Discovery due by 8/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/19/2017.(SWM)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/19/2017. Case Management Plan to be approved by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/5/2017 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Settlement Conference set for 5/4/2018 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/19/2017.(SWM)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF DOCUMENTS AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL: The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action ONLY as to Defendant Star Financial Bank. Therefore, all pending motions with regard to Defendant Star Financial Bank, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT, including Defendant Star Financial Bank's Motions for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint [Dkts. 32 & 33], and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED only to the extent they relate to Defendant Star Financial Bank. Within sixty (60) days of the date of this entry, counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause ONLY as to Defendant Star Financial Bank and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1013/2017. (SWM)
October 12, 2017 Filing 33 First MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to #1 Complaint to January 11, 2018 , filed by Defendant STAR FINANCIAL BANK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rossow, James) Modified on 10/13/2017 to create link (APD).
October 12, 2017 Filing 32 First MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to #1 Complaint to January 11, 2018 , filed by Defendant STAR FINANCIAL BANK. (Rossow, James) Modified on 10/13/2017 to create link (APD).
October 12, 2017 Filing 31 proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES . (Cohron, Travis)
October 12, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Settlement re Star Financial Bank, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES (Cohron, Travis)
October 9, 2017 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint , filed by FORUM CREDIT UNION.(Ruberry, Patrick)
October 6, 2017 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand, filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(Hughes, Logan)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF DOCUMENTS AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL: The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action ONLY as to Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. Therefore, all pending motions with regard to Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED only to the extent they relate to Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. Within sixty (60) days of the date of this entry, counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause ONLY as to Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/3/2017.(SWM)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2017 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/2/2017.(SWM)
October 2, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Settlement re JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA only, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES (Cohron, Travis)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF DOCUMENTS AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL: The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action ONLY as to Defendant Fifth Third Bank. Therefore, all pending motions with regard to Defendant Fifth Third Bank, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED only to the extent they relate to Defendant Fifth Third Bank. Within sixty (60) days of the date of this entry, counsel for the Plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause ONLY as to Defendant Fifth Third Bank and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/29/2017.(SWM)
September 28, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Settlement re Fifth Third Bank, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES (Cohron, Travis)
September 20, 2017 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FORUM CREDIT UNION. (Litchfield, Phillip)
September 19, 2017 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC identifying Corporate Parent EQUIFAX INC. for EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.. (Peterson, Misty)
September 19, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Misty L. Peterson on behalf of Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (Peterson, Misty)
September 18, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Glen Litchfield on behalf of Defendant FORUM CREDIT UNION. (Litchfield, Phillip)
September 18, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Ruberry on behalf of Defendant FORUM CREDIT UNION. (Ruberry, Patrick)
September 18, 2017 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA identifying Corporate Parent JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. for JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA.. (LeClere, Kyle)
September 18, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA. (LeClere, Kyle)
September 18, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle W LeClere on behalf of Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA. (LeClere, Kyle)
September 13, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant STAR FINANCIAL BANK. (Rossow, James)
September 13, 2017 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STAR FINANCIAL BANK. (Rossow, James)
September 13, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Rossow, Jr on behalf of Defendant STAR FINANCIAL BANK. (Rossow, James)
September 8, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Hughes, Logan)
September 8, 2017 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent EXPERIAN PLC, Other Affiliate CENTRAL SOURCE LLC, Other Affiliate ONLINE DATA EXCHANGE LLC, Other Affiliate NEW MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate VANTAGESCORE SOLUTIONS LLC, Other Affiliate OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC for EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC... (Hughes, Logan)
September 8, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Logan C. Hughes on behalf of Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Hughes, Logan)
August 29, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Cohron, Travis)
August 29, 2017 Filing 7 Exhibit List , filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES, Witness List , filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Cohron, Travis)
August 23, 2017 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (APD)
August 22, 2017 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NAD)
August 22, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., FIFTH THIRD BANK, FORUM CREDIT UNION, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA, STAR FINANCIAL BANK. (NAD)
August 22, 2017 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by KIMBERLY A. BARNES. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 8/22/2017. (Cohron, Travis)
August 21, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis W. Cohron on behalf of Plaintiff KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Cohron, Travis)
August 21, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demand against All Defendants, filed by KIMBERLY A. BARNES. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4501948) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Schedule F, #2 Exhibit B- Schedule D, #3 Exhibit C- Schedule D, #4 Exhibit D- Discharge Order, #5 Exhibit E- Dispute Letter, #6 Exhibit F- Equifax Report, #7 Exhibit G- Dispute Letter, #8 Exhibit H- Experian Report, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons Summons to Defendants)(Cohron, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARNES v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NA
Represented By: Kyle W LeClere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Logan C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORUM CREDIT UNION
Represented By: Patrick J. Ruberry
Represented By: Phillip Glen Litchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIFTH THIRD BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Misty L. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAR FINANCIAL BANK
Represented By: James E. Rossow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY A. BARNES
Represented By: Travis W. Cohron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?