SHUMATE v. GENESCO, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JULIA SHUMATE and JULIA E SHUMATE
Defendant: HAT WORLD INC., GENESCO, INC., JOHN DOE DEFENDANTS NOS 1-5, ABC ENTITY DEFENDANTS NOS. 1-5 and HAT WORLD INC. doing business as LIDS SPORTS GROUP
Case Number: 1:2017cv03574
Filed: October 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND APPROVING SETTLEMENT - SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/23/2019.(JRB)
December 20, 2019 Filing 181 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Release, #2 Declaration of Anthony J. Lazzaro, #3 Stipulated Amended Complaint, #4 Proposed Order)(Christy, Chastity)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting #178 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Settlement Approval to 12/20/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/9/2019. (JRB)
December 9, 2019 Filing 179 Submission of Proposed Order , re #178 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to December 20, 2019 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Motion for Settlement Approval, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
December 6, 2019 Filing 178 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to December 20, 2019 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Motion for Settlement Approval, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF A PLEADING AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. All that remains to be done is the execution of documents and/or delivery of funds, if so required, in accordance with their agreement. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are VACATED.IT IS ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of this date, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause or a stipulation of dismissal and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/5/2019.(JRB)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER GRANTINGMOTION FOR LEAVE TOWITHDRAW JOHN C. MCILWEE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS - granting #175 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. John C. McIlwee is GRANTED leave to withdraw as additional counsel for Defendants Genesco, Inc. and Hat World, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/16/2019. (DMW)
August 14, 2019 Filing 175 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance of John C. McIlwee, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McIlwee, John)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #172 MOTION TO VACATE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTEND DEADLINES - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the July 11, 2019 Settlement Conference set before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman is VACATED.IT IS FURTHERE ORDERED that the first phase of discovery shall extend through September 30, 2019 and shall be limited to what bonuses Hat World, Inc. paid to Plaintiff and Opt-in Plaintiffs during the time periods in which the Plaintiff and Opt-in Plaintiffs were paid overtime premiums within their potential and respective statutes of limitations. By October 29, 2019, Defendants may file a motion for summary judgment. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/9/2019.(JRB)
July 8, 2019 Filing 173 Submission of Proposed Order , re #172 Joint MOTION to Vacate Settlement Conference and to Extend Deadlines, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (McIlwee, John)
July 8, 2019 Filing 172 Joint MOTION to Vacate Settlement Conference and to Extend Deadlines, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (McIlwee, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 171 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, John Conlaeth McIlwee hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (McIlwee, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 170 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Bonnie Keane DelGobbo hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #168 Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2019. Discovery due by 7/30/2019. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/1/2019.(JRB)
April 30, 2019 Filing 168 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/30/19 and 08/30/19 for first phase of discovery and deadline for summary judgment motion, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DelGobbo, Bonnie)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Status Conference held on 3/4/2019. Defendant's Emergency Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference (Docket No. #165 ) is GRANTED. The SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for March 5, 2019 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 7/11/2019 at 09:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #316, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Clients with full settlement authority are to be present in person at this conference. (See attachment for particulars, including description of which client(s) must attend.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB)
March 4, 2019 Filing 166 Submission of Proposed Order , re #165 Emergency MOTION to Vacate Settlement Conference, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
March 1, 2019 Filing 165 Emergency MOTION to Vacate Settlement Conference, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting #162 Motion to Bifurcate Discovery and Vacate Scheduling Order - The first phase of discovery shall extend through April 30, 2019. By May 31, 2019, HatWorld, Inc. may file a motion for summary judgment. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/20/2019.(JRB)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS - Motion to Decertify Collective Action is DENIED at this time but its Alternative Motion to Narrow Collective Action #115 is GRANTED; (2) Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action, or Alternatively to Narrow Collective Action Until After Discovery #122 , is DENIED as MOOT; and (3) Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay Enforcement of Court's Order Requiring Production of Store Managers' Identities and Contact Information #117 is DENIED. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/12/2019. (JRB)
February 12, 2019 Filing 162 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery and Vacate Scheduling Order, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Griswold, Joel)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 10:30 AM in room #349, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Richard L. Young. Jury Trial set for 12/9/2019 at 09:00 AM in room #349, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Richard L. Young. The court has allotted five days forthis trial. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/12/2018.(JRB)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Status Conference held on 11/27/2018. Parties were represented by counsel. No further orders are entered at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 SCHEDULING ORDER: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for November 14, 2018, is hereby RESCHEDULED for NOVEMBER 27, 2018 at 10:30 a.m., Indianapolis time (EST), before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed by counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/5/2018.(JRB)
October 12, 2018 Filing 157 Witness List Preliminary, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC., Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #150 Stipulation of Dismissal of Dismissal of Opt-In Plaintiffs Subject to Arbitration Agreements - In light of this order, Defendants' Motion #148 to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs with Arbitration Agreements is now deemed MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/3/2018. (JRB)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Discovery Conference held on 9/26/2018. Parties were represented by counsel. No further orders are entered at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB)
September 28, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE Plaintiff's Preliminary Witness and Exhibit List, filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Appendix With Opt-In Plaintiffs) (Christy, Chastity)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 9/26/2018 at 03:30 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed by counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 9/24/2018.(JRB)
September 20, 2018 Filing 151 Submission of Proposed Order , re #150 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Opt-In Plaintiffs Subject to Arbitration Agreements, filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE, filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE. (Christy, Chastity)
September 19, 2018 Filing 150 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Opt-In Plaintiffs Subject to Arbitration Agreements, filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE. (Christy, Chastity)
September 5, 2018 Filing 149 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #148 MOTION to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs With Arbitration Agreements , filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Carrie Baird)(DelGobbo, Bonnie)
September 5, 2018 Filing 148 MOTION to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs With Arbitration Agreements, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 SCHEDULING ORDER: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for November 16, 2018, is hereby RESCHEDULED for NOVEMBER 14, 2018 at 11:30 a.m., Indianapolis time (EST), before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed by counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/31/18.(JRB)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/16/2018. Discovery due by 4/26/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/21/2019. Settlement Conference set for 3/5/2019 at 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #316, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Status Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/16/2018.(TMB)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiff Richard A. Smith's Claims in Favor of Arbitration - SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/11/2018. (JRB)
July 9, 2018 Filing 144 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE . (Christy, Chastity)
July 3, 2018 Filing 143 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Bradley Freshour Consent Form, #2 Scott Fuller Consent Form, #3 Jenny McCleery Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
July 2, 2018 Filing 142 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Adrian Alexander Consent Form, #2 Craig Alford Consent Form, #3 Marie Alicea Consent Form, #4 Carlos Amador Consent Form, #5 Hans C. Arispe Consent Form, #6 Timothy Bensing Consent Form, #7 Aaron Cahalan Consent Form, #8 Anthony Carney-Hopkins Consent Form, #9 Brian Cassidy Consent Form, #10 Matthew Cuffe Consent Form, #11 Tyler English Consent Form, #12 Veronica Furlong Consent Form, #13 Andrew Gault Consent Form, #14 Amy Grue Consent Form, #15 John Harrison, II Consent Form, #16 Nathan Hutnak Consent Form, #17 Liam Joseph Ireland Consent Form, #18 Jason L. Kurtz Consent Form, #19 Joyce Martin Consent Form, #20 Luke Menne Consent Form, #21 Maxwell Morrison Consent Form, #22 William M. Murphy, Jr. Consent Form, #23 David Nicholas Consent Form, #24 Victoria North Consent Form, #25 Gabriel Quevedo Consent Form, #26 Derek Patton Consent Form, #27 Hilary Petonke Consent Form, #28 Takeisha Randle Consent Form, #29 Micalaya Robinson Consent Form, #30 Rachel Robinson Consent Form, #31 Tierra Rocker Consent Form, #32 Geraldo Rodriguez Consent Form, #33 Rasheen Ross Consent Form, #34 Jason Schabot Consent Form, #35 Mary Grace Stephens Consent Form, #36 Kohle Versalles-Shaw Consent Form, #37 Darrius Whitaker Consent Form, #38 Ashley Williams Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
June 29, 2018 Filing 140 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Matthew D. Ahrans Consent Form, #2 Ashley Bair Consent Form, #3 Alyssa Gonzales Consent Form, #4 Jarrett D. Lorenzo Consent Form, #5 Dennis Mahr Consent Form, #6 Cole McGregor Consent Form, #7 Kristen Proud Consent Form, #8 Maria Steffl Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
June 28, 2018 Filing 139 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Darren Alexander II Consent Form, #2 Jonathan Booey Consent Form, #3 Daniel Enriquez Consent Form, #4 Jameshia Gardner Consent Form, #5 Jasmine Gilchrist Consent Form, #6 Brandon Jones Consent Form, #7 Jamin Lester Consent Form, #8 Celia A. Matter Consent Form, #9 Jimmy McDonald Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
June 26, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Louis Dennis III Consent Form, #2 Derek Dwuma Consent Form, #3 Emilie Paladino Consent Form, #4 Acquneese L. Williams Consent Form, #5 Robin Young Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
June 25, 2018 Filing 137 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Barbara Alvarez Consent Form, #2 Kevin Ball Consent Form, #3 Tracy Braunberger Consent Form, #4 Trevor Currie Consent Form, #5 Steven T. Davis-Quick Consent Form, #6 Tim Dequina Consent Form, #7 Michael Fabiano Consent Form, #8 John D. Gerald Consent Form, #9 Earlene E. Gilbert Consent Form, #10 Darrius Greer Consent Form, #11 Taylor Jenkins Consent Form, #12 Carrie Jones Consent Form, #13 Connor Jordan Consent Form, #14 Mario Keeve Consent Form, #15 Joey Kennedy Consent Form, #16 Demerrick Kirk Consent Form, #17 Carlos Labalan Consent Form, #18 Neal Lammi Consent Form, #19 Samantha Lee Consent Form, #20 Maya E. Lewis Consent Form, #21 Joyce Lumpkins Consent Form, #22 Michael Marro Consent Form, #23 Khaliek McDonald Consent Form, #24 Danielle Meyer Consent Form, #25 Michael Phillips Consent Form, #26 Cecilia M. Rodriguez Consent Form, #27 Mariselena Rodriguez Consent Form, #28 Stephen Seidel Jr. Consent Form, #29 Kurt L. Sleime Consent Form, #30 Coleton Smith Consent Form, #31 Sarah Snyder Consent Form, #32 Weston J. Stanworth Consent Form, #33 Joshua Stierer Consent Form, #34 Joshua Trattner Consent Form, #35 Maria Traylor Consent Form, #36 Marcus Wadley Consent Form, #37 Beverly Williams Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2018 at 12:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/21/2018.(JRB)
June 21, 2018 Filing 135 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Herman Bell Consent Form, #2 Deanna A. Butts Consent Form, #3 Alexander Day Consent Form, #4 Davonte Fuller Consent Form, #5 Juquan Hall li Consent Form, #6 Charlotte J. Hawley Consent Form, #7 LaKishea Maggette Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
June 20, 2018 Filing 134 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Aaron J. Schroeder Consent Form, #2 Lonnie Simpson Consent Form, #3 William Taylor Consent Form, #4 Shannon M. Vazquez Consent Form, #5 Christopher A. Wade Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
June 19, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Asiana Arnold Consent Form, #2 Phillip Cook Consent Form, #3 Carlos Guyton Consent Form, #4 Megan Hampton Consent Form, #5 Jeff Hood Consent Form, #6 Eric Horrilleno Consent Form, #7 Jordan Miller Consent Form, #8 Nicole E. Ross Consent Form, #9 Steven Walker Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
June 18, 2018 Filing 132 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Sara Biery Consent Form, #2 Samantha Brumett Consent Form, #3 Alejandro Caez Consent Form, #4 Traci Carswell Consent Form, #5 Chez Davis Consent Form, #6 Kevin DesRuisseaut Consent Form, #7 David Ford Consent Form, #8 Andrew Gahan Consent Form, #9 Michelle Giuliani Consent Form, #10 Shannae Gordon Consent Form, #11 Marc Haley Consent Form, #12 Devonte Harpool Consent Form, #13 Thomas Hawkins Consent Form, #14 Samantha Henderson Consent Form, #15 Edwin Illa Consent Form, #16 Chelsea Jackson Consent Form, #17 James Joki Consent Form, #18 La'Caris Jones Consent Form, #19 Nakia Kelly Consent Form, #20 Brittany Kimberly Consent Form, #21 Ladarius Ligon Consent Form, #22 Jermaine Mathis Consent Form, #23 Jeffrey Mitchell Consent Form, #24 Jason Nicol Consent Form, #25 Teresa Porter Consent Form, #26 Chad Qucci Consent Form, #27 Sparkle Robinson Consent Form, #28 Wilson J. Santiago Jr. Consent Form, #29 Zachary Sullivan Consent Form, #30 Zachary Waltz Consent Form, #31 Travis A. Wolf Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
June 15, 2018 Filing 131 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Seth Allen Consent Form, #2 Janis N. Cole Consent Form, #3 Julie Demateo Consent Form, #4 Leesa Ellison Consent Form, #5 Elbert Garlow Consent Form, #6 James R. Jones III Consent Form, #7 Mark Maggi Consent Form, #8 Christopher Mulesky Consent Form, #9 Taylor J. Reese Consent Form, #10 Justine Rodgers Consent Form, #11 Randy Trierweiler Consent Form, #12 Justin Vargas Consent Form, #13 Lastar Walker Consent Form, #14 Shelby M. Winters Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
June 14, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Ricardo Assad Consent Form, #2 William R. Beckley Consent Form, #3 Eric Boston Consent Form, #4 Steven Chavez Consent Form, #5 Vanessa Corder Consent Form, #6 Kevin Cunningham Consent Form, #7 Wayne E. Gray Jr. Consent Form, #8 John Harrison Consent Form, #9 Lauren E. Hawkins Consent Form, #10 Ben Kulas Consent Form, #11 Zachary Lucenti Consent Form, #12 Amanda Neilan Consent Form, #13 Francis Ortiz Consent Form, #14 Rian Pierce Consent Form, #15 Jason Poulsen Consent Form, #16 Kiaira Pratcher Consent Form, #17 Javier Reyes Consent Form, #18 Paul M. Sambdman Consent Form, #19 Reese A. Sostre Consent Form, #20 Sidney L. Stout Consent Form, #21 Michael Williams Consent Form, #22 Scott M. Yount Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
June 14, 2018 Filing 129 REPLY in Support of Motion re #122 MOTION to Stay re #118 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #116 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #115 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action, or Alternatively to Narrow Collective Action , #115 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action, or Alternatively to Narrow Collective Action , filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
June 13, 2018 Filing 128 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Edward Brown Consent Form, #2 Ryan P. Davis Consent Form, #3 Tristan Evans Consent Form, #4 Glenn Passarelli Consent Form, #5 Brent Snow Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
June 12, 2018 Filing 127 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Edward Caraballo Consent Form, #2 Casey Davidson Consent Form, #3 Evan Dougherty Consent Form, #4 Taylor Gurunlian Consent Form, #5 Garrett Heiskell Consent Form, #6 Allan Hohman Consent Form, #7 Demond Lake Consent Form, #8 Kendall Longino Consent Form, #9 Virgilio N. Martinez Consent Form, #10 Jessica Nichols Consent Form, #11 Juan R. Reyes Consent Form, #12 Travis Stock Consent Form, #13 Louis Valle Consent Form, #14 Kevin Yuen Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
June 12, 2018 Filing 126 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Isaac Allen Consent Form, #2 Kytisha Anderson Consent Form, #3 Stacy Beckwith Consent Form, #4 Michelle Beller Consent Form, #5 Joseph Billinger Consent Form, #6 Deneshia Bracy Consent Form, #7 Shanta Brice Consent Form, #8 Ashley Britt Consent Form, #9 Dia Britton Consent Form, #10 William Bryandshy Consent Form, #11 David Buechler Jr. Consent Form, #12 Francis Y. Button Consent Form, #13 Jeffery S. Carter Consent Form, #14 George R. Cassa Consent Form, #15 Collyn Clark Consent Form, #16 Michael P. Connelly Jr. Consent Form, #17 Nicholas Cormier Consent Form, #18 Garrett Correia Consent Form, #19 Sharon Daniels Consent Form, #20 Jeremy Davis Consent Form, #21 Shea Davis Consent Form, #22 Gianna Delrose Consent Form, #23 Billie J. Dion Consent Form, #24 Marcus Dixon Consent Form, #25 James Dunn Consent Form, #26 Luis O. Espinoza Consent Form, #27 Brandy E. Evans Consent Form, #28 Dominic Evins Consent Form, #29 Jesse Faatz Consent Form, #30 Eric Fisher Consent Form, #31 Matthew Fortner Consent Form, #32 Courtney Garrett Consent Form, #33 Brittany Goree Consent Form, #34 Sarah Halverson Consent Form, #35 Kenyon Harper Sr. Consent Form, #36 Aimee Hays Consent Form, #37 Nicole Hickman Consent Form, #38 Mary K. Hillhouse Consent Form, #39 Scott Hoggatt Consent Form, #40 Rebekah Holmes Consent Form, #41 Tiffany Hopgood Consent Form, #42 Jamie L. Howard Consent Form, #43 Natalie Howard Consent Form, #44 Dyonte Hutchins Consent Form, #45 Andrew Jacobson Consent Form, #46 Carletta Jones Consent Form, #47 Jeffery J. Jones Consent Form, #48 Yvette Jones Consent Form, #49 Corey B. Kizer Consent Form, #50 Lucas J. Kroening Consent Form, #51 Kyle Kuhlmann Consent Form, #52 Letetita M. London Consent Form, #53 Kerstian Maciejewski Consent Form, #54 Selvin Madrid Consent Form, #55 William F. Mangum Consent Form, #56 Brittany M. Martinelli Consent Form, #57 John D. Massey Consent Form, #58 Matthew McCamie Sr. Consent Form, #59 Dallas Michels Consent Form, #60 Robert O. Mielke Consent Form, #61 Quentin M. Miller Consent Form, #62 Courtney C. Monroe Consent Form, #63 Jennifer Mosley Consent Form, #64 Justin Mulkey Consent Form, #65 Glenn Nelson Consent Form, #66 Josh Nowell Consent Form, #67 Wendy S. Owens Consent Form, #68 Desiree Pagan Consent Form, #69 Kevin Quinones Consent Form, #70 Anthony Rankin Consent Form, #71 Tony Rhoades Consent Form, #72 Tevin Rhodan Consent Form, #73 Kevin Roushey Consent Form, #74 Courtney Rufener Consent Form, #75 Peter Schiller Consent Form, #76 Michael Scullin Consent Form, #77 Andrew Shelton Consent Form, #78 Jared Smith Consent Form, #79 Sarah Stark Consent Form, #80 Jalesha R. Staton Consent Form, #81 Robert Stephan Consent Form, #82 Ricardo Stokes Consent Form, #83 Michael P. Strosnider Consent Form, #84 Shaneeka Taylor Consent Form, #85 Eric Trautman Consent Form, #86 Brad S. Treanor Consent Form, #87 Jessica Villanueva Consent Form, #88 Michael Walls Consent Form, #89 Latoya Watson Consent Form, #90 Suke Watson Consent Form, #91 Victoria Watson Consent Form, #92 George Whalen Consent Form, #93 Kenneth Williams Consent Form, #94 Levi K. Wilson Consent Form, #95 William B. Yates Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
June 7, 2018 Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re #115 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action, or Alternatively to Narrow Collective Action , filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE. (Christy, Chastity)
June 7, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Toneshia Bailey Consent Form, #2 Nicholas W. Barnes Consent Form, #3 Reco D. Cole Consent Form, #4 Mark Davis Consent Form, #5 Natalie Ellis Consent Form, #6 Kyle Holmes Consent Form, #7 Brady M. Johnson Consent Form, #8 Demetrius J. Johnson Consent Form, #9 Karen Kersey Consent Form, #10 Matt Rafferty Consent Form, #11 Crystal B. Shields Consent Form, #12 Talitha Watkins Consent Form, #13 Ronald L. Williams Consent Form, #14 Brittany Witherspoon Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
June 7, 2018 Filing 123 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #122 MOTION to Stay re #118 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #116 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #115 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action, or Alternatively to Narrow Collective Action , filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Christy, Chastity)
June 7, 2018 Filing 122 MOTION to Stay re #118 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #116 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #115 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action, or Alternatively to Narrow Collective Action , filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE. (Christy, Chastity)
June 6, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Brad Ahlgrim Consent Form, #2 Avelino Alicea Consent Form, #3 Craig Appel Consent Form, #4 Rashawnda Bluford Consent Form, #5 Macala Bybee Consent Form, #6 Kyle Cooke Consent Form, #7 Sarah Crosby Consent Form, #8 Taylor Fischer Consent Form, #9 Ian J. Hanna Consent Form, #10 Peter M. Kramer Consent Form, #11 Luis E. Lorenzana Consent Form, #12 Carl A. McDowell Jr. Consent Form, #13 Jonathan Nicholls Consent Form, #14 Kasha Sanabria Consent Form, #15 Matthew Smith Consent Form, #16 Carolyn Tracy Consent Form, #17 Dawn S. Webb Consent Form, #18 John Wicklund Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity)
May 25, 2018 Filing 120 Submission of Proposed Order , re #117 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #112 Order on Motion for Reconsideration Enforcement of Court's Order Requiring Production of Store Managers' Identities and Contact Information, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 25, 2018 Filing 119 Submission of Proposed Order , re #115 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action, or Alternatively to Narrow Collective Action, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 24, 2018 Filing 118 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #115 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action, or Alternatively to Narrow Collective Action CORRECTED, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - C. Baird Declaration)(DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 24, 2018 Filing 117 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #112 Order on Motion for Reconsideration Enforcement of Court's Order Requiring Production of Store Managers' Identities and Contact Information, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 24, 2018 Filing 116 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #115 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action, or Alternatively to Narrow Collective Action , filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - C. Baird Declartion)(DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 24, 2018 Filing 115 MOTION to Decertify Collective Action, or Alternatively to Narrow Collective Action, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 21, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE of Supreme Court Decision Issued May 21, 2018, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SCOTUS Decision re Epic Systems v Lewis) (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER APPROVING NOTICE TO POTENTIAL OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS - The parties jointly filed a Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs. The court, having reviewed the same, hereby authorizes and approves the Notice #86 . Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 5/7/2018.(JRB)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER - #84 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED and #96 Order on Motion to Stay is hereby LIFTED. The Order delineating the Defendants' obligations regarding court-supervised notice to potential opt-in plaintiffs is now in effect. (See Filing No. #94 ). Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 4/27/2018. (LBT)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Status Conference held on 4/19/2018. The stay in this case implemented at Docket No. #96 continues to remain in effect "until such time as the court has ruled on Defendants'... motion to reconsider the court's Order granting conditional certification." (Docket No. #96 ). No further orders are entered at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 SCHEDULING ORDER - TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for April 17, 2018, is hereby RESCHEDULED for APRIL 19, 2018 at 2:30 p.m., Indianapolis time (EST), before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed by counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 4/11/2018.(JRB)
March 23, 2018 Filing 108 ANSWER to #80 Amended Complaint , filed by GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC..(Griswold, Joel)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying #98 Motion for Order Continuing Summary Judgment Until After Discovery, In the Event This Honorable Court Converts Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Into A Motion For Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/12/2018. (JRB)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER denying #81 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim - SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/9/2018. (JRB)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER taking under advisement Defendants' #44 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/1/2018. (TMD)
February 22, 2018 Filing 104 REPLY in Support of Motion re #98 MOTION For Order Continuing Summary Judgment Until After Discovery, In the Event This Honorable Court Converts Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Into A Motion For Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE. (Christy, Chastity)
February 15, 2018 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #98 MOTION For Order Continuing Summary Judgment Until After Discovery, In the Event This Honorable Court Converts Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Into A Motion For Summary Judgment , filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Griswold, Joel)
February 9, 2018 Filing 102 REPLY in Support of Motion re #84 MOTION for Reconsideration re #78 Order on Motion on Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs , filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Griswold, Joel)
February 8, 2018 Filing 101 REPLY in Support of Motion re #81 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT THAT FLUCTUATING WORKWEEK WAS INAPPLICABLE DUE TO PAYMENT OF BONUSES IN ADDITION TO BASE SALARY , filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Griswold, Joel)
February 2, 2018 Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 MOTION for Reconsideration re #78 Order on Motion on Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs , filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE. (Christy, Chastity)
February 1, 2018 Filing 99 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #98 MOTION For Order Continuing Summary Judgment Until After Discovery, In the Event This Honorable Court Converts Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Into A Motion For Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony J. Lazzaro, #2 Defendants' Objection and Responses To Plaintiff's First Set Of Requests For Production of Documents, #3 Proposed Order)(Christy, Chastity)
February 1, 2018 Filing 98 MOTION For Order Continuing Summary Judgment Until After Discovery, In the Event This Honorable Court Converts Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Into A Motion For Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE. (Christy, Chastity)
February 1, 2018 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re #81 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT THAT FLUCTUATING WORKWEEK WAS INAPPLICABLE DUE TO PAYMENT OF BONUSES IN ADDITION TO BASE SALARY , filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE. (Kasson, D)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #90 Emergency Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/31/2018. (JRB)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying #88 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #81 Motion to Dismiss and #84 Motion for Reconsideration - SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/30/2018. (JRB)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Clarification - SEE ENTRY. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/29/2018. (TMD)
January 29, 2018 Filing 93 Submission of Proposed Order , re #88 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 02/15/2018 re #84 MOTION for Reconsideration re #78 Order on Motion on Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Pote, filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE. (Kasson, D)
January 29, 2018 Filing 92 Submission of Proposed Order , re #90 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #78 Order on Motion , filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Griswold, Joel)
January 26, 2018 Filing 91 EXHIBIT re #89 Response in Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 02/15/2018 re #84 MOTION for Reconsideration re #78 Order on Motion on Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs, #81 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT THAT FLUCTUATING WORKWEEK WAS INAPPLICABLE DUE TO PAYMENT OF BONUSES IN ADDITION TO BASE SALARY by GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Griswold, Joel)
January 26, 2018 Filing 90 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #78 Order on Motion , filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Griswold, Joel)
January 26, 2018 Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 02/15/2018 re #84 MOTION for Reconsideration re #78 Order on Motion on Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Pote , filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Griswold, Joel)
January 26, 2018 Filing 88 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 02/15/2018 re #84 MOTION for Reconsideration re #78 Order on Motion on Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs, #81 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT THAT FLUCTUATING WORKWEEK WAS INAPPLICABLE DUE TO PAYMENT OF BONUSES IN ADDITION TO BASE SALARY , filed by Plaintiff JULIA E SHUMATE. (Kasson, D)
January 24, 2018 Filing 87 MOTION for Clarification Regarding Entry on Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs (Doc. 78), filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Griswold, Joel)
January 22, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE of Filing Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs by JULIA E SHUMATE (Attachments: #1 Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs) (Christy, Chastity)
January 19, 2018 Filing 85 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #84 MOTION for Reconsideration re #78 Order on Motion on Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs , filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Griswold, Joel)
January 19, 2018 Filing 84 MOTION for Reconsideration re #78 Order on Motion on Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Griswold, Joel)
January 19, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by John Conlaeth McIlwee on behalf of Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (McIlwee, John)
January 18, 2018 Filing 82 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #81 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT THAT FLUCTUATING WORKWEEK WAS INAPPLICABLE DUE TO PAYMENT OF BONUSES IN ADDITION TO BASE SALARY , filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF CARRIE BAIRD WITH HAT WORLD BONUS POLICIES)(Griswold, Joel)
January 18, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT THAT FLUCTUATING WORKWEEK WAS INAPPLICABLE DUE TO PAYMENT OF BONUSES IN ADDITION TO BASE SALARY, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Griswold, Joel)
January 4, 2018 Filing 80 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JULIA SHUMATE.(Kasson, D) Modified text on 1/5/2018 (TMB).
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying Defendants' #40 Motion to Dismiss and GRANTING Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file her Second Amended Complaint within (5) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/2/2018. (TMD)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #28 Motion for Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs - SEE ENTRY. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/2/2018. (TMD)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Status Conference held on 12/20/2017. Status Conference set for 4/17/2018 at 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Relief from Filing Case Management Plan - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference currently set for DECEMBER 20, 2017 at 10:30 A.M. (EST), before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman is hereby CONVERTED to a TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. The date and time for this conference remain unchanged. The information needed to participate in this telephone conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/7/2017. (JRB)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #72 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/6/2017. (JRB)
December 6, 2017 Filing 73 Joint MOTION for Relief from Filing Case Management Plan, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Attachments: #1Proposed Order (Griswold, Joel) Modified on 12/7/2017 (JRB).
December 4, 2017 Filing 72 MOTION for Attorney(s) Patrick Kasson to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number IP058326). (Attachments: #1 Certificate, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(JDC)
November 27, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Houston Hum on behalf of Plaintiff JULIA SHUMATE. (Hum, Houston)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Lauren Marie Hilsheimer withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/17/2017. (JRB)
November 14, 2017 Filing 69 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance of Lauren Marie Hilsheimer, filed by Defendants GENESCO, INC., HAT WORLD INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. A - Proposed Order)(DelGobbo, Bonnie)
November 10, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE of Pending Motions, filed by Plaintiff JULIA SHUMATE, re #66 Order. (Christy, Chastity)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2017 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/1/2017.(JRB)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ON TRANSFERRED CASE - Within 10 days of the date of this Entry, theparties shall file a joint notice with this court identifying, by date and docket number, all motions they believe are still pending and in need of a ruling. In addition to a list of pending motions, the joint notice should also include, by date and docket number, any submissions associated with those motions, including memorandums in support, responses, and replies. The court will consider any motion not identified as moot. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/31/2017.(JRB)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Anthony J. Lazzaro added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/19/2017. (JRB) Modified text on 10/20/2017 (TMB).
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Chasity L. Christy for JULIA SHUMATE added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 10/19/2017. (JRB)
October 16, 2017 Filing 63 MOTION for Attorney(s) Chastity L. Christy to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $200.00 for two PHV motions, receipt number IP057624), filed by Plaintiff JULIA SHUMATE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(APD)
October 16, 2017 Filing 62 MOTION for Attorney(s) Anthony J. Lazzaro to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $200.00 for two PHV motions, receipt number IP057624), filed by Plaintiff JULIA SHUMATE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(APD)
October 5, 2017 Filing 61 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
October 5, 2017 Filing 60 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 2:17-cv-00157. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Change Venue and directing the Clerk to transfer this case to Southern District of Indiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on October 4, 2017. (jlk) Modified date signed and filed on 10/5/2017 (jlk). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
October 4, 2017 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Indiana, Indianapolis Division. Case file and docket sheet sent electronically. (jlk) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc. re #56 Notice of Appearance (DelGobbo, Bonnie) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims that Fluctuating Workweek was Inapplicable Due to Payment of Performance-Based Bonuses in Addition to Base Salary Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Leave filed by Plaintiff Julia Shumate. (Kasson, D) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
August 21, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo for Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc. (DelGobbo, Bonnie) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
August 18, 2017 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiff Richard A. Smith's Claims in Favor of Arbitration Reply in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiff Richard A. Smith's Claims in Favor of Arbitration filed by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Griswold, Joel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bonnie Keane DelGobbo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 15, 2017. (jlk) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 53 BRIEF re #49 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Griswold, Joel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims that Fluctuating Workweek was Inapplicable Due to Payment of Performance-Based Bonuses in Addition to Base Salary filed by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Griswold, Joel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6079644) of DelGobbo by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Hilsheimer, Lauren) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
August 4, 2017 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiff Richard A. Smith's Claims in Favor of Arbitration filed by Plaintiff Julia Shumate. (Attachments: #1 Judge Boyko's Trial By Jury Order) (Griffin, Lori) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
July 31, 2017 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #40 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims that Fluctuating Workweek was Inapplicable Due to Payment of Performance-Based Bonuses in Addition to Base Salary filed by Plaintiff Julia Shumate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Kasson, D) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTATION ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition is due by 7/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 07/21/2017. (EPD) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/31/2017. Reply in Support of Motion for Extension filed by Plaintiff Julia Shumate. (Kasson, D) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/31/2017. Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension filed by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Opp to Motion for Extension) (Griswold, Joel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
July 20, 2017 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/31/2017. by Plaintiff Julia Shumate. (Kasson, D) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiff Richard A. Smith's Claims in Favor of Arbitration by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A-Declaration of Carrie Baird) (Griswold, Joel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
July 14, 2017 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION For Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiff Julia Shumate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Kasson, D) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
July 13, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc. re #17 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Indiana Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Related Case Decision) (Hilsheimer, Lauren) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION For Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification filed by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index and Declarations) (Griswold, Joel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims that Fluctuating Workweek was Inapplicable Due to Payment of Performance-Based Bonuses in Addition to Base Salary by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims that Fluctuating Workweek was Inapplicable Due to Payment of Performance-Based Bonuses in Addition to Base Salary) (Griswold, Joel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 28, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE by Plaintiff Julia Shumate of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Nathan Cole Consent Form) (Griffin, Lori) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Indiana filed by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (sem) Refiled 36 document to use proper event on 6/28/2017 (sem). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 26, 2017 Notice of Correction re: #38 Reply to Response to Motion (Document previously filed by counsel as a response to motion instead of a reply in support of the motion). (sem) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lauren Marie Hilsheimer (Hilsheimer, Lauren) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 26, 2017 Filing 36 REPLY in Support Motion re #17 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Indiana filed by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Griswold, Joel) Modified text on 6/28/2017 (sem). Modified and corrected event on 6/28/2017 (sem). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Kari Hehmeyer for Plaintiff Julia Shumate (Hehmeyer, Kari) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Indiana filed by Plaintiff Julia Shumate. (Kasson, D) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 8, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Status Conference held on 6/8/2017. (sln) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #29 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants are granted an extension of FOURTEEN (14) DAYS to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Conditional Certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 8, 2017. (jlk) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/14/2017. Defendants' Opposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification filed by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Griswold, Joel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 6/8/2017 11:15 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/14/2017. Defendants' Opposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification Or, In the Alternative, Motion to Equitably Toll the Statute of Limitations for Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiff Julia Shumate. (Christy, Chastity) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
June 5, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/14/2017. Defendants' Opposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Opposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification) (Griswold, Joel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 26, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION For Conditional Certification, Expedited Opt-In Discovery, and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs by Plaintiff Julia Shumate. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Representative Plaintiff Julia Shumate Declaration, #3 Opt-In Plaintiffs Declarations, #4 Opt-In Discovery Directed at Defendant) (Christy, Chastity) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 25, 2017 Filing 27 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Julia Shumate. (Kasson, D) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 24, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori M. Griffin for Plaintiff Julia Shumate (Griffin, Lori) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 24, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE by Plaintiff Julia Shumate of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Donald L. Conley Consent Form, #2 Terry Polley Consent Form, #3 Richard A. Smith Consent Form) (Christy, Chastity) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 24, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Lazzaro for Plaintiff Julia Shumate (Lazzaro, Anthony) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 24, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Chastity Lynn Christy for Plaintiff Julia Shumate (Christy, Chastity) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONTINUED PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Should the matter between the parties not be resolved over the course of the next two (2) weeks, Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint by 6/16/2017. Defendants may have until 7/14/2017 to respond to the anticipated amended complaint. The Plaintiff's Class Certification Motion is due by 7/31/2017. The Court does not stay discovery during the pendency of either the motion to change venue or the anticipated motion to conditionally certify. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/24/2017. (kdp) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 24, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Continued Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 5/24/2017. (sln) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTATION ORDER granting #20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Indiana. Response is now due by 6/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 5/18/17. (NMK) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 18, 2017 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Indiana New date requested 6/12/2017. by Plaintiff Julia Shumate. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kasson, D) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Defendants are ordered to produce to plaintiff the plaintiffs payroll records by May 10, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendants have no obligation to respond to plaintiffs outstanding discovery requests until the date to be set at the continued preliminary pretrial conference. A continued preliminary pretrial conference is scheduled via telephone on May 24, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel to call Court at 614-719-3460 at the appointed time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on May 9, 2017. (jlk) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 5/9/2017. (sln) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 2, 2017 Filing 18 RULE 26(f) REPORT Rule 26(f) Report of the Parties by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Hilsheimer, Lauren) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Indiana by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Indiana, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Carrie Baird, #3 Exhibit Federal Judicial Caseload Statistics - March 31, 2016 Table) (Griswold, Joel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Hat World, Inc., Genesco, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Genesco, Inc. for Hat World, Inc... (Griswold, Joel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Griswold, Joel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 14 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendants' Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Class and Collective Action Complaint filed by Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Griswold, Joel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel C. Griswold for Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc. (Griswold, Joel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joel C. Griswold. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 25, 2017. (jlk) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
April 24, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5929543) of Joel C. Griswold by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Hilsheimer, Lauren) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
April 7, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2017 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Genesco, Inc. answer due 5/1/2017; Hat World, Inc. answer due 5/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/5/2017. (sln) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply New date requested 5/1/2017. by Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Move or File a Responsive Pleading) (Hilsheimer, Lauren) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Marie Hilsheimer for Defendants Genesco, Inc., Hat World, Inc. (Hilsheimer, Lauren) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Genesco, Inc., 1415 Murfreesboro Pike, Nashville, TN 37217. (agm) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Genesco, Inc. and Hat World, Inc. served on 3/20/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (jlk) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
March 15, 2017 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk. (agm) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
February 23, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Non-Issuance of Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons Forms) (agm) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
February 23, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Genesco, Inc., Genesco, Inc. c/o Statutory Agent, Hat World, Inc., and Hat World, Inc. c/o Statutory Agent. (agm) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5852444), filed by Julia Shumate. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form, #7 Summons Form) (Kasson, D) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 10/5/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHUMATE v. GENESCO, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA SHUMATE
Represented By: Chastity Lynn Christy
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Represented By: Lori M. Griffin
Represented By: Kari Hehmeyer
Represented By: D Patrick Kasson
Represented By: Anthony J Lazzaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA E SHUMATE
Represented By: Tyler G. Tarney
Represented By: Lori M. Griffin
Represented By: Kari Hehmeyer
Represented By: Anthony J. Lazzaro
Represented By: Houston Hum
Represented By: D. Patrick Kasson
Represented By: Chastity Lynn Christy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAT WORLD INC.
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: Lauren Marie Hilsheimer
Represented By: John Conlaeth McIlwee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENESCO, INC.
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: Lauren Marie Hilsheimer
Represented By: John Conlaeth McIlwee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE DEFENDANTS NOS 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC ENTITY DEFENDANTS NOS. 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAT WORLD INC. doing business as LIDS SPORTS GROUP
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: Lauren Marie Hilsheimer
Represented By: John Conlaeth McIlwee
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?