CARRIER CORPORATION v. QUEMETCO INC et al

Plaintiff: CARRIER CORPORATION
Defendant: QUEMETCO INC, ECO-BAT INDIANA, L.L.C. and RSR CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv02161
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by CARRIER CORPORATION. QUEMETCO INC , RSR CORPORATION, ECO-BAT INDIANA, L.L.C. waiver sent on 7/16/2018. (Pulliam, Daniel) Modified on 8/17/2018 Edited with defendants' name as to who waived service(NAD).
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CARRIER CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION for CARRIER CORPORATION.. (Harrell, Julian)
July 17, 2018 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
July 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Morris Toner on behalf of Plaintiff CARRIER CORPORATION. (Toner, Kevin)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian E. Harrell on behalf of Plaintiff CARRIER CORPORATION. (Harrell, Julian)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry M. Kelln on behalf of Plaintiff CARRIER CORPORATION. (Kelln, Henry)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Pulliam on behalf of Plaintiff CARRIER CORPORATION. (Pulliam, Daniel)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages against All Defendants, filed by CARRIER CORPORATION. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4970531) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pulliam, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARRIER CORPORATION v. QUEMETCO INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEMETCO INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECO-BAT INDIANA, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSR CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRIER CORPORATION
Represented By: Daniel E. Pulliam
Represented By: Kevin Morris Toner
Represented By: Julian E. Harrell
Represented By: Henry M. Kelln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?