BEELER v. MAJOR TOOL AND MACHINE, INC.

Plaintiff: RODNEY BEELER
Defendant: MAJOR TOOL AND MACHINE, INC and MAJOR TOOL AND MACHINE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02332
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by MAJOR TOOL AND MACHINE, INC..(Sinclair, Paul)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER- Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2018 at 9:00 AM (Eastern) in room #255, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/27/2018.(CBU)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant MAJOR TOOL AND MACHINE, INC.. (Sinclair, Paul)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAJOR TOOL AND MACHINE, INC.. (Sinclair, Paul)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul H. Sinclair on behalf of Defendant MAJOR TOOL AND MACHINE, INC.. (Sinclair, Paul)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN of Service, filed by RODNEY BEELER. MAJOR TOOL AND MACHINE, INC. served on 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proof of Service)(Cummings, Paul)
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MAJOR TOOL AND MACHINE, INC. (REO)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff RODNEY BEELER. (Cummings, Paul)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Request for Jury Trial against MAJOR TOOL AND MACHINE, INC, filed by RODNEY BEELER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4994984) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cummings, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEELER v. MAJOR TOOL AND MACHINE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY BEELER
Represented By: Paul J. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR TOOL AND MACHINE, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR TOOL AND MACHINE, INC.
Represented By: Paul H. Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?