HOLLENBECK v. INDIANA UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE et al
Plaintiff: Anna Hollenbeck
Defendant: James Brokaw, Ernie Talarico, INDIANA UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE, Joanne Wojcieszek and Patrick Bankston
Case Number: 1:2018cv02358
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by All Defendants.(Cohen, Hamish)
September 24, 2018 Filing 19 Reassignment of Case to Judge James R. Sweeney II. Judge Tanya Walton Pratt is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number ( 1:18-cv-2358-JRS-DLP), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (WMK)
August 30, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing of Affidavits of Service of Summons by ANNA HOLLENBECK (Moor, Edward)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 4:00 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/23/2018.(CBU)
August 21, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Consent, filed by Plaintiff ANNA HOLLENBECK, re #15 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time. (Moor, Edward)
August 21, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants PATRICK BANKSTON, JAMES BROKAW, INDIANA UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE, ERNIE TALARICO, JOANNE WOJCIESZEK. (Cohen, Hamish)
August 21, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Hamish S. Cohen on behalf of Defendants PATRICK BANKSTON, JAMES BROKAW, INDIANA UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE, ERNIE TALARICO, JOANNE WOJCIESZEK. (Cohen, Hamish)
August 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Mattingly on behalf of Defendants PATRICK BANKSTON, JAMES BROKAW, INDIANA UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE, ERNIE TALARICO, JOANNE WOJCIESZEK. (Mattingly, Jonathan)
August 10, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to JAMES BROKAW, ERNIE TALARICO, JOANNE WOJCIESZEK. (NAD)
August 9, 2018 Filing 11 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to JAMES BROKAW. (Moor, Edward)
August 9, 2018 Filing 10 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to JOANNE WOJCIESZEK. (Moor, Edward)
August 9, 2018 Filing 9 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to ERNIE TALARICO. (Moor, Edward)
August 3, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to PATRICK BANKSTON. (NAD) Modified on 8/3/2018 (replaced -- court seal)(DJH). (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/3/2018) (DJH).
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to PATRICK BANKSTON. (Moor, Edward)
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Edward Roy Moor, Jr hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Moor, Edward)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to INDIANA UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE. (DJH)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to INDIANA UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE. (Moor, Edward)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Roy Moor, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Anna Hollenbeck. (Moor, Edward)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anna Hollenbeck. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4997445) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moor, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLLENBECK v. INDIANA UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brokaw
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Represented By: Hamish S. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernie Talarico
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Represented By: Hamish S. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Represented By: Hamish S. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Wojcieszek
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Represented By: Hamish S. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Bankston
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Represented By: Hamish S. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Hollenbeck
Represented By: Edward Roy Moor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?