BAUMGART v. EXCEPTIONAL THERAPY, LLC

Plaintiff: SHARNA BAUMGART
Defendant: EXCEPTIONAL THERAPY, LLC d/b/a EXCEPTIONAL REHAB and EXCEPTIONAL THERAPY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02376
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
0 Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
1 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2018 6 Reassignment of Case to Judge James R. Sweeney II. Judge Tanya Walton Pratt is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number ( 1:18-cv-2376-JRS-MJD), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (WMK)
August 14, 2018 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by SHARNA BAUMGART. EXCEPTIONAL THERAPY, LLC waiver sent on 8/6/2018. (Cummings, Paul)
August 6, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff SHARNA BAUMGART. (Cummings, Paul)
August 6, 2018 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 6, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to EXCEPTIONAL THERAPY, LLC. (DJH)
August 3, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Request for Jury Trial against EXCEPTIONAL THERAPY, LLC d/b/a EXCEPTIONAL REHAB, filed by SHARNA BAUMGART. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4999924) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cummings, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAUMGART v. EXCEPTIONAL THERAPY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARNA BAUMGART
Represented By: Paul J. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXCEPTIONAL THERAPY, LLC d/b/a EXCEPTIONAL REHAB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXCEPTIONAL THERAPY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?