UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $24,200 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $24,200 UNITED STATES CURRENCY and $24,200.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Case Number: 1:2018cv02377
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: William T Lawrence
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting USA's #5 Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that AUSA Eric P. Babbs' appearance shall be entered as counsel of record for Plaintiff, the United States of America and that AUSA Debra G. Richards' appearance on its behalf is terminated from the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/27/2018. (SWM)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Attorney , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babbs, Eric)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property. Signed by the Clerk on 8/6/2018. Paper copies to USM.(JDC)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra G. Richards on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Richards, Debra)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture in Rem against $24,200 UNITED STATES CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property)(Richards, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $24,200 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $24,200 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $24,200.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Debra G. Richards
Represented By: Eric Parker Babbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?