HOWARD v. CANNIFF et al

Plaintiff: LANCE HOWARD
Defendant: BUTT, LATOUR, SCHURMAN, KERIS, IRT LAW LIBRARY SUPERVISOR, WEXFORD HEALTH, HINSHAW, E. SHELLY, D. DAVIS, CRAIG CANNIFF, BUCKNER, B. HUBER, DEWANYGER, COLESTOCK and DAUSS
Case Number: 1:2018cv02499
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
0 Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
1 Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2018 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Judgment, filed by Plaintiff LANCE HOWARD. c/s (CKM)
September 25, 2018 20 CLOSED JUDGMENT - The court, having this day made its Entry, IT IS NOW ADJUDGED that this cause of action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/25/2018. (CKM)
September 25, 2018 19 ENTRY - Dismissing Action and Directing Entry of Final Judgment; The plaintiff is a prisoner who is barred by 1915(g) from litigating without full prepayment of the filing fee. Because the plaintiff is not eligible to proceed in forma pauperis and the filing fee has not been paid, this action is now subject to immediate termination. This action is now dismissed without prejudice. The pending motions, dkt #7 and #9 , are denied. Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/25/2018. (CKM)
September 19, 2018 18 DECLARATION by LANCE HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration 2, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 5-1, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 6-1, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Cover Letter 1, #12 Cover Letter 2, #13 Envelope (forward from the Court of Appeals). (MAC)
September 17, 2018 17 Submission Re Problems with E-fling, filed by Plaintiff LANCE HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Envelope 1, #6 Envelope 2) (CKM)
September 17, 2018 16 Submission of Manual Filing, filed by Plaintiff LANCE HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope 1, #2 Envelope 2) (CKM) Modified on 9/18/2018 (CKM).
September 4, 2018 15 DECLARATION of Lance Howard by LANCE HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter, #2 Envelope)(CKM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #3 Envelope 2) (CKM).
August 24, 2018 14 DECLARATION by LANCE HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits). (MAC)
August 24, 2018 13 Submission of Supplemental Complaint, filed by Plaintiff LANCE HOWARD. (MAC)
August 21, 2018 12 DECLARATION of Lance Howard by LANCE HOWARD. c/s (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit a-1) (CKM)
August 21, 2018 11 DECLARATION of Lance Howard by LANCE HOWARD. c/s (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 5-1, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 7-1, #5 Exhibit 7-2, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10) (CKM)
August 21, 2018 10 DECLARATION of Lance Howard by LANCE HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2-1, #4 Exhibit 3)(CKM)
August 20, 2018 9 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint, filed by Plaintiff LANCE HOWARD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Supplemental Complaint, #2 Exhibits, #3 Declaration). (MAC)
August 20, 2018 8 DECLARATION of Lance Howard re #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LANCE HOWARD. (MAC)
August 20, 2018 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff LANCE HOWARD. (MAC)
August 20, 2018 6 ENTRY - Directing Payment of Filing Fee and Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Mr. Howard shall have through September 17, 2018, in which to pay the $400.00 filing fee for this civil action. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action. Mr. Howard's motion for preliminary injunction, dkt. #3 , is denied. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/20/2018. (CKM)
August 14, 2018 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 14, 2018 4 DECLARATION of Lance Howard re #3 Motion for Preliminary InjunctionMotion for TRO, #2 Complaint filed by LANCE HOWARD. (DJH)
August 14, 2018 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction/Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff, LANCE HOWARD. (DJH)
August 14, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against BUCKNER, BUTT, CRAIG CANNIFF, COLESTOCK, D. DAVIS, DEWANYGER, HINSHAW, B. HUBER, IRT LAW LIBRARY SUPERVISOR, KERIS, LATOUR, SCHURMAN, E. SHELLY, WEXFORD HEALTH, filed by LANCE HOWARD. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C letters)(DJH)
August 14, 2018 1 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by LANCE HOWARD located at PENDLETON CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by LANCE HOWARD to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOWARD v. CANNIFF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHURMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRT LAW LIBRARY SUPERVISOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HINSHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. SHELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG CANNIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCKNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. HUBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEWANYGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLESTOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAUSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANCE HOWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?