PETRO v. MILLER

Plaintiff: ROBERT PETRO, JR.
Defendant: THOR R. MILLER
Case Number: 1:2018cv02508
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
0 Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
1 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2018 7 CLOSED JUDGMENT - The court, having this day made its Entry, IT IS NOW ADJUDGED that this cause of action is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/3/2018.(NAD)
October 3, 2018 6 Featured Case Order Directing Entry of Final Judgment - This action is dismissed for failure to state a claim. The Entry of August 16, 2018, dismissed the operative complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b). The plaintiff was given a period of time in which to show cause why Judgment should not be entered. That time has passed without a response from the plaintiff. This action is now dismissed. Judgment dismissing this action shall now issue. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/3/2018.(NAD)
August 16, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER - granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The assessment of even an initial partial filing fee is waived because the plaintiff has no assets and no means by which to pay a partial filing fee. Accordingly, no initial partial filing fee is due at this time. (See Order.) Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/16/2018. (NAD)
August 16, 2018 4 Featured Case Entry - Dismissing Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings. The plaintiff's complaint must be dismissed for each of the reasons set forth in the Order. The plaintiff shall have through September 13, 2018, in which to show cause why Judgment consistent with this Entry should not issue. (See Order.) Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/16/2018.(NAD)
August 15, 2018 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 15, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff ROBERT PETRO, JR. (Attachments: #1 transactions)(DJH)
August 15, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against THOR R. MILLER, filed by ROBERT PETRO, JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 exhibits including letters, Policy and Administrative Procedures,)(DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PETRO v. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT PETRO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOR R. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?