CISLO v. BANDY et al

Plaintiff: RONNIE B. CISLO
Defendant: CRAIG CRAIGE, JOHN DOE #1, DALE BANDY, JOHN DOE #2 and ERIC RAWLINS
Case Number: 1:2018cv02510
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
0 Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
1 Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Cochran on behalf of Defendant DALE BANDY. (Cochran, Kelly)
September 28, 2018 13 ENTRY - Denying Motion for Counsel; The plaintiff's motion for assistance with recruiting counsel, dkt. #12 , is denied as premature. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/28/2018. (CKM)
September 25, 2018 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff RONNIE B. CISLO. (MAC)
September 25, 2018 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by DALE BANDY. DALE BANDY waiver sent on 8/30/2018. (Esenwein, Jill)
September 25, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Esenwein on behalf of Defendant DALE BANDY. (Esenwein, Jill)
August 30, 2018 9 Documents for Service by IDOC - re #2 Complaint, #7 Entry, #8 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk. (CKM)
August 30, 2018 8 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk. (CKM)
August 29, 2018 7 ENTRY - Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Screening Complaint, Dismissing Insufficient Claims and Directing Service of Process; The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #3 , is granted. The plaintiff's motion requesting service of process, dkt. #5 , is denied as unnecessary. The clerk is designated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) to issue process to Dale Bandy in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the complaint, applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/29/2018. (CKM)
August 15, 2018 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 15, 2018 5 MOTION Requesting Service of Process by the United States Marshal Service, filed by Plaintiff RONNIE B. CISLO. (DJH)
August 15, 2018 4 DECLARATION of Ronnie Bee Cislo re #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RONNIE B. CISLO. (DJH)
August 15, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff, RONNIE B. CISLO. (Attachments: #1 Transaction History Inquiry)(DJH)
August 15, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against DALE BANDY, CRAIG CRAIGE, JOHN DOE #1, JOHN DOE #2, and ERIC RAWLINS filed by RONNIE B. CISLO. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 appeal of disciplinary action, #2 Proposed Summons)(DJH)
August 15, 2018 1 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by RONNIE B. CISLO located at PENDLETON CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by RONNIE B. CISLO to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (DJH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CISLO v. BANDY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG CRAIGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DALE BANDY
Represented By: Jill Esenwein
Represented By: Kelly Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC RAWLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONNIE B. CISLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?