BECK v. POOR et al
Plaintiff: DONALD W. BECK
Defendant: STEPHANIE POOR and UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2018cv02575
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 CLOSED DISMISSED-Plaintiff hereby gives notice of voluntary dismissal is Acknowledged (marginal). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/21/2018.(CBU)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff DONALD W. BECK. (Pleasants, Larry) Modified on 9/21/2018 - Edited for administrative purposes (NAD).
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to STEPHANIE POOR, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (HET)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry W. Pleasants on behalf of Plaintiff DONALD W. BECK. (Pleasants, Larry)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by DONALD W. BECK. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5026727) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Pleasants, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BECK v. POOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD W. BECK
Represented By: Larry W. Pleasants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIE POOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?