MCMAINS v. CORNWELL et al

Plaintiff: RONALD MCMAINS
Defendant: MICHAEL CORNWELL and MAVERICK TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02607
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff RONALD MCMAINS . (Christie, Lee)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE , re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff RONALD MCMAINS. (Brown-Henry, Katherine)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Anne Brown-Henry on behalf of Plaintiff RONALD MCMAINS. (Brown-Henry, Katherine)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2018 10:30 AM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/25/2018.(SWM)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Trial by Jury, filed by MICHAEL CORNWELL, MAVERICK TRANSPORTATION, LLC.(Whitten, Christopher)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants MICHAEL CORNWELL, MAVERICK TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (Whitten, Christopher)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MICHAEL CORNWELL, MAVERICK TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (Whitten, Christopher)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Whitten on behalf of Defendants MICHAEL CORNWELL, MAVERICK TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (Whitten, Christopher)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Culp on behalf of Defendants MICHAEL CORNWELL, MAVERICK TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (Culp, James)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery Circuit Court 1, case number 54C01-1807-CT-000761, filed by MICHAEL CORNWELL, MAVERICK TRANSPORTATION, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5031586) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Request for Admission, #2 State Court Record (Complaint for Damages, Summons to Maverick Transportation, LLC, Appearance of Attorney Lee C. Christie, Appearance of Attorney Christopher R. Whitten, Motion for Enlargement of Time and Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitten, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCMAINS v. CORNWELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD MCMAINS
Represented By: Lee C. Christie
Represented By: Katherine Anne Brown-Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CORNWELL
Represented By: James L. Culp
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAVERICK TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Represented By: James L. Culp
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?