INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC. v. MOBILE TECH, INC.
Plaintiff: INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC.
Defendant: MOBILE TECH, INC. d/b/a MOBILE TECHNOLOGIES INC. and MTI, formerly known as MERCHANDISING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., MOBILE TECH, INC., MOBILE TECH, INC. doing business as MOBILE TECHNOLOGIES INC. doing business as MTI formerly known as MERCHANDISING TECHNOLOGIES, INC. and MERCHANDISING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02653
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: William T Lawrence
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 The Southern District of Indiana receives email notice from the Clerk of District of Oregon regarding electronic case transfer. This case was received electronically by District of Oregon on 9/27/2018 was assigned case number 3:18-cv-01720 in the receiving court. (JDC)
September 26, 2018 Filing 17 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the District of Oregon. Case transferred electronically to District of Oregon, on September 27, 2018. (CBU)
September 26, 2018 Filing 16 CLOSED TRANSFER to United States District Court for the District of Oregon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/26/2018.(CBU)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/29/2018 for the Defendant, Mobile Tech Inc to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/26/2018. (CBU)
September 21, 2018 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by Defendant MOBILE TECH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cohen, Edward)
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to October 29, 2018 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond, filed by Defendant MOBILE TECH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cohen, Edward)
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Cohen on behalf of Defendant MOBILE TECH, INC.. (Cohen, Edward)
September 20, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and related pleadings served on Mobile Tech, Inc., filed by INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC.. (Smikle, Richard)
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Other Related Pleadings served on Mobile Tech, Inc. d/b/a Mobile Technologies Inc. and MTI, formerly known as Merchandising Technologies, Inc. on September 11, 2018, filed by INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC.. (Smikle, Richard)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Substitute Exhibit A to Its Complaint by INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Smikle, Richard)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Tim F. Williams for INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/29/2018 (dist made) (CBU)
August 29, 2018 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MOBILE TECH, INC. (REO)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. McKeown on behalf of Plaintiff INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC.. (McKeown, Eric)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tim F. Williams to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5036102), filed by Plaintiff INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Appearance)(Smikle, Richard)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC. identifying Corporate Parent INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC. for INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC... (Smikle, Richard)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Smikle on behalf of Plaintiff INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC.. (Smikle, Richard)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MOBILE TECH, INC. d/b/a MOBILE TECHNOLOGIES INC. and MTI, formerly known as MERCHANDISING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., filed by INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5036095) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Smikle, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC. v. MOBILE TECH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INVUE SECURITY PRODUCTS INC.
Represented By: Richard A. Smikle
Represented By: Eric J. McKeown
Represented By: Tim F. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOBILE TECH, INC. d/b/a MOBILE TECHNOLOGIES INC. and MTI, formerly known as MERCHANDISING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOBILE TECH, INC.
Represented By: Edward A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOBILE TECH, INC. doing business as MOBILE TECHNOLOGIES INC. doing business as MTI formerly known as MERCHANDISING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Edward A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCHANDISING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Edward A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?