M.W. et al v. METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP
Plaintiff: M W, Florence W, M.W. and FLORENCE W.
Defendant: MSD Lawrence Townshi and METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP
Case Number: 1:2018cv02698
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: William T Lawrence
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1415
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/8/2018. Settlement Conference set for 2/11/2019 at 9:00 AM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. **SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS** Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #10 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim , filed by M.W., FLORENCE W..(Curlin, Alexandra)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP on behalf of all parties, noting differences to be resolved at Case Management Conference. (Pinegar, Alexander)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs, filed by METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP.(Pinegar, Alexander)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2018 09:00 AM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/18/2018.(SWM)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by M.W., FLORENCE W.. METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP waiver sent on 8/30/2018. (Curlin, Alexandra)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Phillip Pinegar on behalf of Defendant METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP. (Pinegar, Alexander)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Request for Waiver of Service for Summons Supplied by FLORENCE W. AND M.W.. (Curlin, Alexandra) Modified on 8/31/2018 (HET).
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Marie Curlin on behalf of Plaintiffs Florence W., M.W. (Curlin, Alexandra) Modified on 8/31/2018 (HET).
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiffs Florence W., M.W. (Curlin, Alexandra) Modified on 8/31/2018 (HET).
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dr. Shawn Smith, METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP on August 30, 2018, filed by Plaintiffs Florence W., M.W. (Curlin, Alexandra) Modified on 8/31/2018 (HET). Modified on 8/31/2018 (HET).
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP, filed by FLORENCE W. AND M.W. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 0756-5041269) (Curlin, Alexandra) Modified on 8/30/2018 to add payment information (HET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.W. et al v. METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSD Lawrence Townshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN SCHOOL DISTRICT OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP
Represented By: Alexander Phillip Pinegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M W
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Curlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence W
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Curlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.W.
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Curlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORENCE W.
Represented By: Alexandra Marie Curlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?