SUKURS et al v. CLARKE et al

Plaintiff: CHARLES P. SUKURS and SARA N. SUKURS
Defendant: AAA FREIGHT, INC. and JONATHAN C. CLARKE
Case Number: 1:2018cv02784
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/19/2018.(SWM)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Entry and Order on Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on October 12, 2018, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on February 12, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Discovery due by 12/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/15/2018.(SWM)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Defendants' #16 Motion to Reset Initial Pretrial Conference. Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 10/12/2018 11:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The remaining instructions of the court's scheduling order (Dkt. #10 ) remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/4/2018.(SWM)
October 3, 2018 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Reset the Initial Pre-Trial Conference, filed by Defendants AAA FREIGHT, INC., JONATHAN C. CLARKE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfleging, Lesley)
October 1, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by All Defendants.(Pfleging, Lesley)
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs CHARLES P. SUKURS, SARA N. SUKURS . (Norris, Richard)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J. Wombles on behalf of Plaintiffs CHARLES P. SUKURS, SARA N. SUKURS. (Wombles, Bradley)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley A. Pfleging on behalf of Defendants AAA FREIGHT, INC., JONATHAN C. CLARKE. (Pfleging, Lesley)
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 Submission of Additional State Court records. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2018 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/13/2018.(SWM)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants AAA FREIGHT, INC., JONATHAN C. CLARKE. (Strawbridge, Katherine)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R. Foos on behalf of Defendants AAA FREIGHT, INC., JONATHAN C. CLARKE. (Foos, Robert)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendants AAA FREIGHT, INC., JONATHAN C. CLARKE. (Strawbridge, Katherine)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AAA FREIGHT, INC.. (Strawbridge, Katherine)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine S. Strawbridge on behalf of Defendants AAA FREIGHT, INC., JONATHAN C. CLARKE. (Strawbridge, Katherine)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 Submission of State Court Record, filed by Defendants AAA FREIGHT, INC., JONATHAN C. CLARKE. (Strawbridge, Katherine)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Defendants AAA FREIGHT, INC., JONATHAN C. CLARKE. (Strawbridge, Katherine)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from MARION SUPERIOR COURT 5, case number 49D05-1807-CT-029365, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5054975) (Strawbridge, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUKURS et al v. CLARKE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA FREIGHT, INC.
Represented By: Robert R. Foos
Represented By: Katherine S. Strawbridge
Represented By: Lesley A. Pfleging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN C. CLARKE
Represented By: Robert R. Foos
Represented By: Katherine S. Strawbridge
Represented By: Lesley A. Pfleging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES P. SUKURS
Represented By: Richard L. Norris
Represented By: Bradley J. Wombles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARA N. SUKURS
Represented By: Richard L. Norris
Represented By: Bradley J. Wombles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?