BETTS v. CROWN EQUIPMENT CORPORATION et al.
Plaintiff: LAMARR BETTS and INTELLIGRATED SYSTEMS, LLC
Defendant: CROWN EQUIPMENT CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv02923
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 16 Submission of Signature Requirement re #15 Answer to Complaint by INTELLIGRATED SYSTEMS, LLC. (Pearcy, Christopher)
November 1, 2018 Filing 15 Defendant Intelligrated Systems, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Damages and Request for Jury Trial, filed by INTELLIGRATED SYSTEMS, LLC.(Pearcy, Christopher)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint Amended, filed by CROWN EQUIPMENT CORPORATION.(Schultz, Thomas)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Defendant Intelligrated Systems, LLC's #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File answer to complaint to 11/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/11/2018. (SWM)
October 3, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTELLIGRATED SYSTEMS, LLC. (Pearcy, Christopher)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to November 1, 2018 , filed by Defendant INTELLIGRATED SYSTEMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pearcy, Christopher)
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 Jurisdictional Statement Supplemental by CROWN EQUIPMENT CORPORATION. (Schultz, Thomas)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Pearcy on behalf of Defendant INTELLIGRATED SYSTEMS, LLC. (Pearcy, Christopher)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Blanford on behalf of Defendant INTELLIGRATED SYSTEMS, LLC. (Blanford, Theodore)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Stefanie Rachelle Crawford hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Crawford, Stefanie)
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 Submission of Additional State Court Records. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTRY ON JURISDICTION - It has come to the Court's attention that Defendant's Notice of Removal fails to allege all of the facts necessary to determine whether this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case. The Notice of Removal alleges that this Court has jurisdiction based upon diversity of citizenship. However, the Notice of Removal fails to sufficiently allege the citizenship of co-defendant Intelligrated Systems, LLC. Therefore, Defendant Crown Equipment Corporation is ORDERED to file a Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement that establishes the Court's jurisdiction over this case. This statement should specifically identify the members of Defendant Intelligrated Systems, LLC and those members' citizenship. This jurisdictional statement is due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Entry. (See Entry.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/24/2018.(NAD)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CROWN EQUIPMENT CORPORATION. (Schultz, Thomas)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Defendant CROWN EQUIPMENT CORPORATION. (Schultz, Thomas)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D11-1806-CT-025038, filed by CROWN EQUIPMENT CORPORATION. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5072896) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Schultz, Thomas) Modified on 9/24/2018 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BETTS v. CROWN EQUIPMENT CORPORATION et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAMARR BETTS
Represented By: Stefanie Rachelle Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTELLIGRATED SYSTEMS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWN EQUIPMENT CORPORATION
Represented By: Thomas R. Schultz
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Bucher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?