STEWART et al v. E & H TRANSPORT NETWORK et al
Plaintiff: RAYMOND T STEWART, SHEILA K STEWART, RAYMOND T. STEWART and SHEILA K. STEWART
Defendant: E & H TRANSPORT NETWORK and CRAIG ORLOFF
Case Number: 1:2018cv03016
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs RAYMOND T. STEWART, SHEILA K. STEWART . (Hall-Justice, Susannah)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by All Plaintiffs (Hall-Justice, Susannah) Modified on 11/21/2018 (CKM).
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Defendants E & H TRANSPORT NETWORK, CRAIG ORLOFF. (David, Lynsey)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses, filed by E & H TRANSPORT NETWORK, CRAIG ORLOFF.(David, Lynsey)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/28/2018 at 10:00 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/23/2018.(CBU)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E & H TRANSPORT NETWORK, CRAIG ORLOFF. (David, Lynsey)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R. Foos on behalf of Defendants E & H TRANSPORT NETWORK, CRAIG ORLOFF. (Foos, Robert)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendants E & H TRANSPORT NETWORK, CRAIG ORLOFF. (David, Lynsey)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynsey F. David on behalf of Defendants E & H TRANSPORT NETWORK, CRAIG ORLOFF. (David, Lynsey)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior 12, case number 49D12-1808-CT-034667, filed by CRAIG ORLOFF, E & H TRANSPORT NETWORK. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5088326) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record)(David, Lynsey) Modified on 10/2/2018, duplicate docket text removed (HET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEWART et al v. E & H TRANSPORT NETWORK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND T STEWART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA K STEWART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND T. STEWART
Represented By: Susannah M. Hall-Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA K. STEWART
Represented By: Susannah M. Hall-Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E & H TRANSPORT NETWORK
Represented By: Robert R. Foos
Represented By: Lynsey F. David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG ORLOFF
Represented By: Robert R. Foos
Represented By: Lynsey F. David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?