RICHARDSON v. MEADE & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Plaintiff: TERRENCE RICHARDSON
Defendant: MEADE & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03088
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing filing of documents authorizing dismissal within 30 days of the date of this entry. All pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/25/2018.(CBU)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN of Service, filed by TERRENCE RICHARDSON. MEADE & ASSOCIATES, INC. served on 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service)(Steinkamp, John)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MEADE & ASSOCIATES, INC. (DJH)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff TERRENCE RICHARDSON. (Steinkamp, John)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against MEADE & ASSOCIATES, INC., filed by TERRENCE RICHARDSON. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5097198) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The May 3, 2018 letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A - Relevant pages of Plaintiff's July 13, 2018 TransUnion credit report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Steinkamp, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHARDSON v. MEADE & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRENCE RICHARDSON
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEADE & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?