COVVES, LLC v. BIGMOUTH INC., et al.
Plaintiff: COVVES LLC and COVVES, LLC
Defendant: BIGMOUTH, INC., BIGMOUTH, LLC, BIGMOUTH INC. and BIGMOUTH LLC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03307
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2019 04:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrialconference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/12/2018.(SWM)
December 10, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Answer in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Answer) (JDH)
December 5, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff COVVES, LLC. (McArthur, Stephen)
November 30, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against COVVES, LLC, filed by BIGMOUTH LLC., BIGMOUTH INC..(Mulligan, Edward)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Morgan T. Nickerson for BIGMOUTH INC. and BIGMOUTH LLC. added. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within 7 days. Copy to Morgan T. Nickerson and Stephen McArthur via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/26/2018. (SWM) Modified on 11/26/2018 (SWM).
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Stephen McArthur for COVVES, LLC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/20/2018 (dist made) (CBU)
November 20, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Morgan T. Nickerson to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5164645), filed by Defendants BIGMOUTH INC., BIGMOUTH LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certification of Morgan T. Nickerson in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pr Hac Vice)(Mulligan, Edward)
November 20, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Automatic Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants BIGMOUTH INC., BIGMOUTH LLC. (Mulligan, Edward)
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward B. Mulligan, V on behalf of Defendants BIGMOUTH INC., BIGMOUTH LLC.. (Mulligan, Edward)
November 19, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen McArthur to Appear pro hac vice (Filing Fee pd. Receipt #0756-5150295) (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff COVVES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Stephen McArthur, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Overhauser, Paul)
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint re: Defendant, BIGMOUTH, LLC served on Scot Swenberg on October 31, 2018, filed by COVVES, LLC. (Overhauser, Paul)
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint re: Defendant, BIGMOUTH, Inc. served on Scot Swenberg on October 31, 2018, filed by COVVES, LLC. (Overhauser, Paul)
November 12, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen McArthur to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5150295), filed by Plaintiff COVVES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Overhauser, Paul)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (APD)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to BIGMOUTH LLC. (APD)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by April M. Jay on behalf of Plaintiff COVVES, LLC. (Jay, April)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to BIGMOUTH LLC.. (Overhauser, Paul)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (APD)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B. Overhauser on behalf of Plaintiff COVVES, LLC. (Overhauser, Paul)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BIGMOUTH INC. (DJH)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to BIGMOUTH, INC.. (Overhauser, Paul)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Design Patent Infringement and Trade Dress Infringement against BIGMOUTH, INC., BIGMOUTH, LLC, filed by COVVES LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5129292) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Design Patent US D787617 S, #2 Exhibit 2 - Design Patent US D783370, #3 Exhibit 3 - BIGMOUTH Specimens, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email string re: Amazon complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - April 2018 Notice to Amazon, #6 Exhibit 6 - BigMouth product pages, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons BIGMOUTH INC, #9 Proposed Summons BIGMOUTH LLC)(Overhauser, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COVVES, LLC v. BIGMOUTH INC., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COVVES LLC
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COVVES, LLC
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Represented By: Stephen McArthur
Represented By: April M. Jay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIGMOUTH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIGMOUTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIGMOUTH INC.
Represented By: Edward B. Mulligan, V
Represented By: Morgan T. Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIGMOUTH LLC.
Represented By: Edward B. Mulligan, V
Represented By: Morgan T. Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?