TERRELL et al v. GUILLEN et al

Plaintiff: TERESA TERRELL and MARK TERRELL
Defendant: FIGUS TRUCKING, INC. and ENRIQUE GUILLEN
Case Number: 1:2018cv03314
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: William T Lawrence
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Whitten, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2019 at 12:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/19/2018.(JRB)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Brooke, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Emily Marie Gettum hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Gettum, Emily)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY - REGARDING JURISDICTIONAL ALLEGATIONS ; It has come to the Court's attention that the jurisdictional allegations in the Complaint in this case are insufficient to establish the existence of complete diversity of citizenship between the parties. Several of the parties are natural persons, and while the Complaint addresses residence, "residence and citizenship are not synonyms and it is the latter that matters for purposes of diversity jurisdiction. Within fourteen days of the date of this Entry, the Plaintiffs shall file a supplemental jurisdictional statement that sets forth the specific information necessary to establish the diversity of citizenship of the parties to this case. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/27/2018. (CKM)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Marie Gettum on behalf of Defendants FIGUS TRUCKING, INC., ENRIQUE GUILLEN. (Gettum, Emily)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FIGUS TRUCKING, INC.. (Whitten, Christopher)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants FIGUS TRUCKING, INC., ENRIQUE GUILLEN. (Whitten, Christopher)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Whitten on behalf of Defendants FIGUS TRUCKING, INC., ENRIQUE GUILLEN. (Whitten, Christopher)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FIGUS TRUCKING, INC., ENRIQUE GUILLEN. (REO)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Brooke on behalf of Plaintiffs MARK TERRELL, TERESA TERRELL. (Brooke, John)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5130134) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Brooke, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TERRELL et al v. GUILLEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIGUS TRUCKING, INC.
Represented By: Emily Marie Gettum
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENRIQUE GUILLEN
Represented By: Emily Marie Gettum
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA TERRELL
Represented By: John H. Brooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK TERRELL
Represented By: John H. Brooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?