LEGGIO v. WEBER et al

Plaintiff: JOHN LEGGIO
Defendant: DANIEL ROBINSON and STEVEN WEBER
Case Number: 1:2018cv03322
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/26/2018.(CBU)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by All Defendants.(Belch, Paul)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Thomas Belch on behalf of Defendants DANIEL ROBINSON, STEVEN WEBER. (Belch, Paul)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court 11, case number 49D11-1809-CT-037059, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5130920) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record)(Belch, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEGGIO v. WEBER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL ROBINSON
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN WEBER
Represented By: Paul Thomas Belch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN LEGGIO
Represented By: Donald L. Poynter
Represented By: John Douglas Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?