DJURIC v. MYKHAYLYLUK et al

Plaintiff: PETAR DJURIC
Defendant: RUSLAN MYKHAYLYLUK and BESTONE EXPRESS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03451
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 01/29/2019 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/16/2018.(JRB)
November 8, 2018 Filing 23 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (APD)
November 8, 2018 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00287. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue #13 , and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to transfer this case to the Southern District of Indiana for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/7/2018. (lhc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Bestone Express, Inc., Ruslan Mykhaylyluk. (Sylvester, R) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Petar Djuric. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Zlatic, Daniel) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue. Plaintiff's Response to be filed by 10/26/2018. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/10/18. No pdf attached.(sa) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by Plaintiff Petar Djuric. (Rubino, Terrence) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Zlatic on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zlatic, Daniel) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER VACATING the R16B Preliminary Pretrial Conference on 10/11/2018 and the related ddl within which to file a proposed discovery plan to be reset where necessary after ruling on Dft {12] MOTION for Change of Venue. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/1/2018. (smb) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Bestone Express, Inc., Ruslan Mykhaylyluk.(Sylvester, R) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Bestone Express, Inc., Ruslan Mykhaylyluk. (Sylvester, R) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendants Bestone Express, Inc., Ruslan Mykhaylyluk. (Sylvester, R) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (smb) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2018 11:00 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 10/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/17/2018. (smb) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/17/2018. (smb) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Answer due 9/28/2018. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Bestone Express, Inc., Ruslan Mykhaylyluk ; answer due by August 31, 2018. (Sylvester, R) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by R Gregory Sylvester on behalf of All Defendants (Sylvester, R) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Petar Djuric. Bestone Express, Inc. served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018. (Rubino, Terrence) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bestone Express, Inc.. (Hughes, Logan) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Logan C Hughes on behalf of Bestone Express, Inc., Ruslan Mykhaylyluk (Hughes, Logan) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bestone Express, Inc., Ruslan Mykhaylyluk. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (New Case) (sct) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E Polen, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Polen, Michael) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3640685.), filed by Petar Djuric. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Addendum)(Rubino, Terrence) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 11/8/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DJURIC v. MYKHAYLYLUK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSLAN MYKHAYLYLUK
Represented By: Logan C. Hughes
Represented By: R. Gregory Sylvester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BESTONE EXPRESS, INC.
Represented By: Logan C. Hughes
Represented By: R. Gregory Sylvester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETAR DJURIC
Represented By: Michael Eugene Polen, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel John Zlatic
Represented By: Terrence M. Rubino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?