THOMAS v. HAMLIN et al

Plaintiff: DAVID M. THOMAS and DAVID MICHAEL THOMAS
Defendant: JOSHUA M. HAMLIN and LESSORS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv03506
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: William T Lawrence
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/8/2019.(SWM)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Discovery due by 3/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/18/2018.(SWM)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on December 14, 2018, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants JOSHUA M. HAMLIN, LESSORS, INC. and Plaintiff David Thomas. (Whitten, Christopher)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER- Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/14/2018.(CBU)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Trial by Jury, filed by JOSHUA M. HAMLIN, LESSORS, INC..(Whitten, Christopher)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LESSORS, INC.. (Whitten, Christopher)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants JOSHUA M. HAMLIN, LESSORS, INC.. (Whitten, Christopher)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Culp on behalf of Defendants JOSHUA M. HAMLIN, LESSORS, INC.. (Culp, James)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Whitten on behalf of Defendants JOSHUA M. HAMLIN, LESSORS, INC.. (Whitten, Christopher)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hancock Circuit Court, case number 30C01-1809-CT-001714, filed by LESSORS, INC., JOSHUA M. HAMLIN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5150212) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' First Request for Admission Directed to Plaintiff, #2 State Court Record (Summons to Lessors, Inc., Summons to Joshua Hamlin, Plaintiff's Complaint, Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case of Christopher R. Whitten and James L. Culp, Motion for Enlargement of Time, Proof of Services on Defendant Joshua Hamlin and Proof of Service on Defendant Lessors, Inc.), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitten, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMAS v. HAMLIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA M. HAMLIN
Represented By: James L. Culp
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LESSORS, INC.
Represented By: James L. Culp
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID M. THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID MICHAEL THOMAS
Represented By: Joseph Stalmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?