LUCAS et al v. KOURI

Plaintiff: BECCA LUCAS and PHILIP K. LUCAS
Defendant: KRISTIN T. KOURI
Case Number: 1:2018cv03519
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Timothy Loren Karns withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/7/2019. (SWM)
January 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance of Timothy L. Karns, filed by Defendant KRISTIN T. KOURI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal of Appearance)(Karns, Timothy)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Thornburg on behalf of Defendant KRISTIN T. KOURI. (Thornburg, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2019. Discovery due by 10/18/2019. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/21/2018. (GD)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/18/2018. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/27/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore.). Settlement Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 1:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/21/2018.(SWM)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant KRISTIN T. KOURI and Plaintiffs, Philip K. Lucas and Becca Lucas. (Karns, Timothy)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2018 09:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/27/2018.(SWM)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Response to Request for Admission and Alternative Interrogatory Propounded by Defendant, filed by Plaintiffs BECCA LUCAS, PHILIP K. LUCAS (Kruse, Paul)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Sherman Kruse on behalf of Plaintiffs BECCA LUCAS, PHILIP K. LUCAS. (Kruse, Paul)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR.***MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) Modified on 11/14/2018 (HET).
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Schiferl on behalf of Defendant KRISTIN T. KOURI. (Schiferl, Kevin)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Service of Notice to All Adverse Parties and to the State Court Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal by KRISTIN T. KOURI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing of Petition for Removal, #2 Exhibit USDC Notice of Removal with State Court Pleadings, Civil Cover Sheet, and Demand)(Karns, Timothy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Loren Karns on behalf of Defendant KRISTIN T. KOURI. (Karns, Timothy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hendricks Superior Court No. 1, case number 32D01-1809-CT-000144, filed by KRISTIN T. KOURI. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5151076) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record ((State Court Docket, Complaint for Damages, Appearance, Summons, Notice, Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Notice, Notice, USPS Tracking, Appearance, Ageed Motion for Initial Enlargement of Time, Order Granting Agreed Motion for Initial Enlargement of Time, Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit B, Damages)(Karns, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUCAS et al v. KOURI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTIN T. KOURI
Represented By: Timothy Loren Karns
Represented By: Kevin C. Schiferl
Represented By: Robert B. Thornburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BECCA LUCAS
Represented By: Paul Sherman Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP K. LUCAS
Represented By: Paul Sherman Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?