MARINO et al v. BYLSMA

Plaintiff: FREDDY MARINO, CARLOS CAPRISTAN, CLARA ARIAS CAMPOS and GLADYS CAPRISTAN
Defendant: TYLER BYLSMA
Case Number: 1:2018cv03697
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - It is hereby ordered, adjudged and decreed that this matter is hereby dismissed, with prejudice, costs paid. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/26/2018.(JRB)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal , filed by Defendant TYLER BYLSMA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Raibley, Zachary)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Filing of Documents Authorizing Dismissal: The court has been advised that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this case. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED. Within ninety days of the date of this entry, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal (consistent with the agreement of the parties). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/14/2018.(SWM)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Resolution, filed by Defendant TYLER BYLSMA (Raibley, Zachary)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2018 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/30/2018.(SWM)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by TYLER BYLSMA.(Schiferl, Kevin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary C. Raibley on behalf of Defendant TYLER BYLSMA. (Raibley, Zachary)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Schiferl on behalf of Defendant TYLER BYLSMA. (Schiferl, Kevin)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe Circuit Court 6, case number 53C06-1810-CT-002188, filed by TYLER BYLSMA. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5169988) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (Complaint, Summons, Appearances, Notice of Service of Complaint, Motion for Enlargement), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schiferl, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARINO et al v. BYLSMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDDY MARINO
Represented By: David M. Henn
Represented By: Brett Michael Haworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS CAPRISTAN
Represented By: David M. Henn
Represented By: Brett Michael Haworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARA ARIAS CAMPOS
Represented By: David M. Henn
Represented By: Brett Michael Haworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLADYS CAPRISTAN
Represented By: David M. Henn
Represented By: Brett Michael Haworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYLER BYLSMA
Represented By: Zachary C. Raibley
Represented By: Kevin C. Schiferl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?