BRISCOE v. INDIANAPOLIS METRO. POLICE DEPT. et al
Plaintiff: THEODORE CEDRICK BRISCOE, JR.
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, ARNOLD P. BARATZ, D.O.C. I.Y.C., INDIANAPOLIS METRO. POLICE DEPT. and MARION COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2018cv03867
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Entry Granting Renewed #7 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Ten Dollars and Zero Cents ($10.00). He shall have through February 12, 2019, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Failure to pay the initial partial filing fee as directed in this Entry could result in the dismissal of the action for failure to comply with Court orders and failure to prosecute. After the initial partial filing fee is received, the Court will screen the complaint in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/8/2019. (NAD)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 Renewed MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff THEODORE CEDRICK BRISCOE, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY DISCUSING PENDING MOTIONS - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is denied without prejudice because he failed to submit a certified copy of his trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint on December 7, 2018, as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2). He shall have through January 9, 2019, in which to renew his request for in forma pauperis status with the required information. The plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel, dkt. #3 , is denied as premature. The defendants have not been served and no answer has been filed. The plaintiff's motion for hearing and redress, dkt. #4 , is denied because it contains no explanation of the relief plaintiff seeks other than the title. The motion itself is blank. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/12/2018. (NAD)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Hearing and Redress, filed by Plaintiff THEODORE CEDRICK BRISCOE, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel, filed by Plaintiff THEODORE CEDRICK BRISCOE, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff THEODORE CEDRICK BRISCOE, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, ARNOLD P. BARATZ, D.O.C. I.Y.C., INDIANAPOLIS METRO. POLICE DEPT., MARION COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER AGENCY, filed by THEODORE CEDRICK BRISCOE, JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRISCOE v. INDIANAPOLIS METRO. POLICE DEPT. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARNOLD P. BARATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.O.C. I.Y.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANAPOLIS METRO. POLICE DEPT.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THEODORE CEDRICK BRISCOE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?