ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV et al v. BADESHA BROTHERS INC et al
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC. and ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Defendant: BADESHA BROTHERS INC and MAKHAN BADESHA
Case Number: 1:2018cv03953
Filed: December 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES, filed by Plaintiffs ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SREAM, INC.. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC. (LAB) (DWH)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MAKHAN BADESHA, BADESHA BROTHERS INC. (DWH)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MAKHAN BADESHA. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 19, 2018 (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) CLERK'S NOTICE - The plaintiff has tendered a summons that is not in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(a)(1)(B), which requires a summons be directed to the defendant. Plaintiff has tendered a summons directed to Harjinder Badesha - which is not named as a defendant in this case. The Clerk cannot issue a summons that is not properly completed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(b). Plaintiff is directed to resubmit a properly completed summons for issuance. (PKP)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BADESHA BROTHERS INC. (REO)
December 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan G. Chance on behalf of Plaintiffs ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC.. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5198879) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Chance, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV et al v. BADESHA BROTHERS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan G. Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Represented By: Jonathan G. Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BADESHA BROTHERS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAKHAN BADESHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?