ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV et al v. BAPSHREE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC. and ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Defendant: BAPSHREE, LLC and DINESHKUMAR PATEL
Case Number: 1:2018cv03956
Filed: December 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (CKM)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES, filed by Plaintiffs ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SREAM, INC.. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BAPSHREE, LLC, DINESHKUMAR PATEL. (REO)
December 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan G. Chance on behalf of Plaintiffs ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC.. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5198895) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Chance, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV et al v. BAPSHREE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan G. Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Represented By: Jonathan G. Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAPSHREE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DINESHKUMAR PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?