SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. NEW et al

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: David N Knuth, Synergy Investment Services, LLC, Alan H New, DAVID N. KNUTH and ALAN H. NEW
Case Number: 1:2018cv03975
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - denying #2 Motion for Permanent Injunction *** SEE ORDER ***. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 2/7/2019. (CKM)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SYNERGY INVESTMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Bont, Jonathan)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to SYNERGY INVESTMENT SERVICES, LLC. (LAB) (CKM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Nestor on behalf of Plaintiff SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Nestor, Christine)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Koonin on behalf of Plaintiff SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Koonin, Russell)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Lauren Grass on behalf of Defendants DAVID N. KNUTH, ALAN H. NEW, SYNERGY INVESTMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Grass, Stephanie)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Bont on behalf of Defendants DAVID N. KNUTH, ALAN H. NEW, SYNERGY INVESTMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Bont, Jonathan)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Other Relief, filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Alan New Consent, #2 Exhibit A-1 Alan New Judgment, #3 Exhibit B - David Knuth Consent, #4 Exhibit B-1 David Knuth Judgment, #5 Exhibit C - Synergy Consent, #6 Exhibit C-1 Synergy Judgment)(Koonin, Russell)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive and Other Relief against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Koonin, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. NEW et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David N Knuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy Investment Services, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan A. Bont
Represented By: Stephanie Lauren Grass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan H New
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID N. KNUTH
Represented By: Jonathan A. Bont
Represented By: Stephanie Lauren Grass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN H. NEW
Represented By: Jonathan A. Bont
Represented By: Stephanie Lauren Grass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Russell Koonin
Represented By: Christine Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?