NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC. v. ALLISON

Plaintiff: NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.
Defendant: RUSSELL ALLISON
Case Number: 1:2018cv03998
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
0 Judge: Tim A Baker
1 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 26 Mail Returned as undeliverable (Return to Sender; Unable to Forward). #18 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct sent to Counsel Geffrey Dean Rainbolt at COOPER & LYBRAND 2900 One American Square, Box 82002, Indianapolis, IN 46282-0002. (NAD)
February 8, 2019 Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC. . (Rainbolt, Geffrey)
February 8, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Geffrey Dean Rainbolt hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. Geffrey D. Rainbolt (Rainbolt, Geffrey)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 3/14/2019 re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/1/2019. (NAD)
January 31, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to March 14, 2019 re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted , filed by Plaintiff NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knoblock, Erick)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 3/7/2019 re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case or Dismiss, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/30/2019. (NAD)
January 29, 2019 Filing 20 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #6 Scheduling Order sent to Geffrey Dean Rainbolt. (NAD)
January 29, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to March 7, 2019 re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case or Dismiss, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) , filed by Plaintiff NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knoblock, Erick)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Michael D. Gray's #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON d/b/a ANDY ALLIGATOR'S FUN PARK. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within 7 days. Copy to Michael D. Gray and Geffrey Dean Rainbolt via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/28/2019. (SWM)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Kara N. Ellison's #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON d/b/a ANDY ALLIGATOR'S FUN PARK. Copy to Kara N. Ellison and Geffrey Dean Rainbolt via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/28/2019. (SWM)
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael D. Gray to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5246876) , filed by Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - certification of Michael D. Gray, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rabinowitch, Michael)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) 1 to Appear pro hac vice Kara N. Ellison (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5246856) , filed by Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - certification of Kara Ellison, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rabinowitch, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael D. Gray to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5246876), filed by Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - certification of Michael D. Gray, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rabinowitch, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) 1 to Appear pro hac vice Kara N. Ellison (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5246856), filed by Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - certification of Kara Ellison, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rabinowitch, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted , filed by Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 summary, #3 Exhibit 3 docket, #4 Exhibit 4 complaint 2)(Rabinowitch, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM upon which relief can be granted, filed by Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rabinowitch, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case or Dismiss, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) , filed by Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -IN Judicial caseload profile, #2 Exhibit 2 - OK Judicial caseload profile, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rabinowitch, Michael)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case or Dismiss, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), filed by Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Rabinowitch, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.. (Knoblock, Erick)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 Statement Regarding Notice of Removal by NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.. (Knoblock, Erick)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2019 10:00 AM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Copy to Geffrey Dean Rainbolt via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/15/2019.(SWM) Modified on 1/15/2019 (SWM).
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 Submission of additional State Court records. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Carter on behalf of Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Carter, James)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Rabinowitch on behalf of Defendant RUSSELL ALLISON. (Rabinowitch, Michael)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Civil Court 4, case number 49D04-1811-PL-046045, filed by RUSSELL ALLISON. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5205533) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record State Court Record (Docket Sheet, Complaint, Summonses, Appearances, Notice of Automatic Enlargment), #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabinowitch, Michael) Modified on 12/20/2018 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC. v. ALLISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOBLE ROMAN'S, INC.
Represented By: Geffrey Dean Rainbolt
Represented By: Erick P. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSSELL ALLISON
Represented By: Michael Rabinowitch
Represented By: James A. Carter
Represented By: Michael D. Gray
Represented By: Kara N. Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?