ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV et al v. KIJ PARTNERSHIP et al

Plaintiff: SREAM, INC. and ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Defendant: KIJ PARTNERSHIP D/B/A NORTH STREET & VAPE, CHARNPREET KAUR, AMANPREET KAUR and KIJ PARTNERSHIP
Case Number: 1:2018cv04053
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, William Kenneth Doss hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Doss, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KIJ PARTNERSHIP. (Doss, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants AMANPREET KAUR, CHARNPREET KAUR, KIJ PARTNERSHIP. (Doss, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William Kenneth Doss on behalf of Defendants AMANPREET KAUR, CHARNPREET KAUR, KIJ PARTNERSHIP. (Doss, William)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit USPTO REGISTRATION, #3 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #4 Exhibit License Agreement, #5 Exhibit Ratification Agreement, #6 Exhibit Product Offered for Sale) (JDH)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - Refer to docket entry #10 .*** NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit USPTO REGISTRATION, #3 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #4 Exhibit License Agreement, #5 Exhibit Ratification Agreement, #6 Exhibit Product Offered for Sale) (JDH) Modified on 1/2/2019 (JDH).
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
December 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES, filed by Plaintiffs ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AMANPREET KAUR, CHARNPREET KAUR, KIJ PARTNERSHIP. (HET)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan G. Chance on behalf of Plaintiffs ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC.. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SREAM, INC.. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV. (Chance, Jonathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5212009) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPTO REGISTRATION, #2 Exhibit Trademark Registration, #3 Exhibit License Agreement, #4 Exhibit Ratification Agreement, #5 Exhibit Product Offered for Sale, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Chance, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV et al v. KIJ PARTNERSHIP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan G. Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Represented By: Jonathan G. Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIJ PARTNERSHIP D/B/A NORTH STREET & VAPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARNPREET KAUR
Represented By: William Kenneth Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANPREET KAUR
Represented By: William Kenneth Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIJ PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: William Kenneth Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?