HILL v. WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC
Plaintiff: KIARRA-LYNN HILL
Defendant: WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv04065
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC.(Burke, Brandi)
February 18, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Trellis Holdings Inc., d/b/a Trellis Ventures, Other Affiliate Texas Guaranteed Student Loan Corporation d/b/a Trellis Company, sole owner of Trellis Holdings, Inc. for WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC.. (Burke, Brandi)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to 2/21/2019 for the Defendant to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/17/2019. (CBU)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 11:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/16/2019.(CBU)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to February 21, 2019 in which to #1 Complaint (Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint), filed by Defendant WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burke, Brandi)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandi L. Burke on behalf of Defendant WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC. (Burke, Brandi)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, John Thomas Steinkamp hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Pending Cases) (Steinkamp, John)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC. (HET)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff KIARRA-LYNN HILL. (Steinkamp, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC, filed by KIARRA-LYNN HILL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5212875) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The September 21, 2018, letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A - Relevant pages of Plaintiff's November 16, 2018, TransUnion credit report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Steinkamp, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYPOINT RESOURCE GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Brandi L. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIARRA-LYNN HILL
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?