HABER LAND CO. LTD. v. AMERICAN STEEL CITY INDUSTRIAL LEASING, INC. et al

Plaintiff: HABER LAND CO. LTD.
Defendant: CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC, MOSEY REAL ESTATE, INC., ALD INDIANA, LLC, LUCAS-FERMAT LLC, GE ENGINE SERVICES, INC., MOSEY MANUFACTURING CO. INC. and AMERICAN STEEL CITY INDUSTRIAL LEASING, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv04091
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
0 Judge: Tim A Baker
1 Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
2 Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Elizabeth B. Dawson for CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/22/2019 (dist made) (CBU)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Kirsten L. Nathanson for CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/22/2019 (dist made) (CBU)
February 21, 2019 Filing 37 AMENDED Summons Issued as to AMERICAN STEEL CITY INDUSTRIAL LEASING, INC., MOSEY REAL ESTATE, INC. (MAC)
February 20, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALD INDIANA, LLC. (Boyers, James)
February 20, 2019 Filing 34 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to AMERICAN STEEL CITY INDUSTRIAL LEASING, INC., MOSEY REAL ESTATE, INC.. (Schroeder, Brianna)
February 20, 2019 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- TSCA Notice, #2 Exhibit 2- ALD TSCA Notice)(Schroeder, Brianna)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting Defendant Caterpillar Global Mining LLC's #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 3/8/2019. No further enlargement of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/19/2019. (SWM)
February 19, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth B. Dawson to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5293083), filed by Defendant CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Ex. A) Certification of Elizabeth B. Dawson in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reeder, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kirsten L. Nathanson to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5293009), filed by Defendant CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Ex. A) Certification of Kirsten L. Nathanson in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reeder, Michael)
February 18, 2019 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/8/19 to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reeder, Michael)
February 5, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan R. Brillault on behalf of Defendant GE ENGINE SERVICES, INC.. (Brillault, Megan)
February 1, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC. (Reeder, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Caterpillar IPX LLC, Other Affiliate CATERPILLAR INC. for CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC.. (Reeder, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jonathan Reeder on behalf of Defendant CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC. (Reeder, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Hatchett on behalf of Defendant CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC. (Hatchett, David)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 3:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference in the format set forth in the model CMP found on the Court's website (www.insd.uscourts.gov). Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines as set forth. *SEE ORDER.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/31/19. (GD)
January 29, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant GE ENGINE SERVICES, INC.. (Brillault, Megan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:18-cv-04091-JMS-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (REO)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/29/2019. (ADH)
January 28, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant MOSEY MANUFACTURING CO. INC.. (Krahulik, Angela)
January 28, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MOSEY MANUFACTURING CO. INC.. (Krahulik, Angela)
January 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel B. Gardner on behalf of Defendant MOSEY MANUFACTURING CO. INC.. (Gardner, Samuel)
January 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Pease Krahulik on behalf of Defendant MOSEY MANUFACTURING CO. INC.. (Krahulik, Angela)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Megan R. Brillault for GE ENGINE SERVICES, INC. added. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within 7 days. Copy to Megan R. Brillault via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/28/2019. (SWM)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ALD INDIANA, LLC. (Boyers, James)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Wells Gritton on behalf of Defendant ALD INDIANA, LLC. (Gritton, Allison)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James McGinnis Boyers on behalf of Defendant ALD INDIANA, LLC. (Boyers, James)
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Megan R. Brillault to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number IP063683), filed by Defendant GE ENGINE SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope).(MAC)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant LUCAS-FERMAT LLC. (Biggs, Donald)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to ALD INDIANA, LLC, AMERICAN STEEL CITY INDUSTRIAL LEASING, INC., CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC, GE ENGINE SERVICES, INC., LUCAS-FERMAT LLC, MOSEY MANUFACTURING CO. INC., and MOSEY REAL ESTATE, INC. (DJH)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to ALD INDIANA, LLC, AMERICAN STEEL CITY INDUSTRIAL LEASING, INC., CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC, GE ENGINE SERVICES, INC., LUCAS-FERMAT LLC, MOSEY MANUFACTURING CO. INC., MOSEY REAL ESTATE, INC.. (Schroeder, Brianna)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald C. Biggs on behalf of Defendant LUCAS-FERMAT LLC. (Biggs, Donald)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J. Deveau on behalf of Defendant LUCAS-FERMAT LLC. (Deveau, Frank)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd J. Janzen on behalf of Plaintiff HABER LAND CO. LTD.. (Janzen, Todd)
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by HABER LAND CO. LTD. (Schroeder, Brianna) Modified on 2/12/2019 (JDH).
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna J. Schroeder on behalf of Plaintiff HABER LAND CO. LTD.. (Schroeder, Brianna)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by HABER LAND CO. LTD.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5216106) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Original TSCA Notice, #2 Exhibit 2, ALD TSCA Notice, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Schroeder, Brianna) Modified on 1/3/2019 (double docket text removed from attachment descriptions) (DJH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HABER LAND CO. LTD. v. AMERICAN STEEL CITY INDUSTRIAL LEASING, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING, LLC
Represented By: David L. Hatchett
Represented By: Kirsten L. Nathanson
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Dawson
Represented By: Michael Jonathan Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOSEY REAL ESTATE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALD INDIANA, LLC
Represented By: Allison Wells Gritton
Represented By: James McGinnis Boyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUCAS-FERMAT LLC
Represented By: Frank J. Deveau
Represented By: Donald C. Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE ENGINE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Megan R. Brillault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOSEY MANUFACTURING CO. INC.
Represented By: Samuel B. Gardner
Represented By: Angela Pease Krahulik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STEEL CITY INDUSTRIAL LEASING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HABER LAND CO. LTD.
Represented By: Todd J. Janzen
Represented By: Brianna J. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?