REXEL USA, INC v. BRAGG et al
Plaintiff: REXEL USA, INC
Defendant: RICHARD BRAGG and CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00035
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Burgan, Blake)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants RICHARD BRAGG, CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY. (Burgan, Blake)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants RICHARD BRAGG, CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY. (Burgan, Blake)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Changing Initial Pretrial Conference to a Telephone Conference: The initial pretrial conference set for February 28, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern), will be held by TELEPHONE, instead of being conducted as an inperson conference in Indianapolis. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court'selectronic filing system with the call-in information to be ued to participate in the conference. All other provisions of the court's order remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/25/2019.(SWM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff REXEL USA, INC . (Attachments: #1 Supplement ESI Supplement to Case Management Plan)(Seidler, Robert)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2019 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/4/2019.(SWM)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Thornton Escoffery on behalf of Defendants RICHARD BRAGG, CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY. (Escoffery, Erin)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Labora Group, Inc. for CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY.. (Burgan, Blake)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants RICHARD BRAGG, CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY. (Burgan, Blake)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake J. Burgan on behalf of Defendants RICHARD BRAGG, CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY. (Burgan, Blake)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to RICHARD BRAGG, CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY. (HET)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin S. Schroeder on behalf of Plaintiff REXEL USA, INC. (HET)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Seidler on behalf of Plaintiff REXEL USA, INC. (HET)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RICHARD BRAGG, CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, filed by REXEL USA, INC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number IP063435) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Employee Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(HET) Modified on 1/4/2019 to add payment information (HET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REXEL USA, INC v. BRAGG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD BRAGG
Represented By: Erin Thornton Escoffery
Represented By: Blake J. Burgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By: Erin Thornton Escoffery
Represented By: Blake J. Burgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REXEL USA, INC
Represented By: Robert F. Seidler
Represented By: Caitlin S. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?