TENTH STREET BAPTIST CHURCH, INC. v. CONSOLIDATED CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, et al.
Plaintiff: TENTH STREET BAPTIST CHURCH, INC.
Defendant: METROPOLITAN BOARD OF ZONING APPEALS OF MARION COUNTY, INDIANA DIVISION II and THE CONSOLIDATED CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, MARION COUNTY, INDIANA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00040
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 14 Submission - TENDER OF BOARD RECORD, filed by Plaintiff TENTH STREET BAPTIST CHURCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return to Verified Petition for Judicial Review, #2 Exhibit B - Board Record - Part A (pages 1-76), #3 Exhibit C - Board Record - Part B (pages 77-122), #4 Exhibit D - Transcript)(Moore, John)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Thomas J.O. Moore withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/5/2019. (TMB)
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Defendants METROPOLITAN BOARD OF ZONING APPEALS OF MARION COUNTY, INDIANA DIVISION II, THE CONSOLIDATED CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, MARION COUNTY, INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Bowman on behalf of Defendants METROPOLITAN BOARD OF ZONING APPEALS OF MARION COUNTY, INDIANA DIVISION II, THE CONSOLIDATED CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, MARION COUNTY, INDIANA. (Bowman, Daniel)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2019 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/23/2019.(JRB)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Record of the zoning decision to 2/13/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/15/2019. (JRB)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by METROPOLITAN BOARD OF ZONING APPEALS OF MARION COUNTY, INDIANA DIVISION II, THE CONSOLIDATED CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, MARION COUNTY, INDIANA.(Moore, Thomas)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 Submission of Additional State Court Records. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DWH)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 13, 2019 to File Board Record, filed by Plaintiff TENTH STREET BAPTIST CHURCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, John)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TENTH STREET BAPTIST CHURCH, INC.. (Moore, John)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE , filed by Defendants Consolidated City of Indianapolis/Marion County Indiana, Metropolitan Board of Zoning Appeals of Marion County, Indiana Division II, re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record) (Moore, Thomas)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J.O. Moore on behalf of Defendants Consolidated City of Indianapolis/Marion County Indiana, Metropolitan Board of Zoning Appeals of Marion County, Indiana Division II. (Moore, Thomas)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, case number 49D10-1812-MI-049155, filed by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5222250) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Petition, Exhibit A, Exhibit B, Exhibit C, Exhibit D, Appearance, Summons, Summons, Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Motion for Enlargement of Time, Exhibit A, #2 State Court Record Petition, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TENTH STREET BAPTIST CHURCH, INC. v. CONSOLIDATED CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENTH STREET BAPTIST CHURCH, INC.
Represented By: John J. Moore
Represented By: Brian J. Tuohy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN BOARD OF ZONING APPEALS OF MARION COUNTY, INDIANA DIVISION II
Represented By: Thomas J.O. Moore
Represented By: Daniel Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CONSOLIDATED CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, MARION COUNTY, INDIANA
Represented By: Thomas J.O. Moore
Represented By: Daniel Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?